This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2020 at 08:34:43 (UTC).

Martinez et al v. JVA Industries Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Martinez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against JVA Industries Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07977

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexander Ramirez

Luis Martinez

Grevil Martinez

Defendants

Joseph Alfano

JVA Industries Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacob Aronauer

Attorney at The Law Offices of Jacob Aronauer

225 Broadway Suite 307

New York, NY 10007

Defendant Attorney

Peter John Koulikourdis

Attorney at Koulikourdis & Associates

45 Hudson Street

Hackensack, NJ 07601

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter John Koulikourdis on behalf of Joseph Alfano, JVA Industries Inc...(Koulikourdis, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#16

(#16) FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#15

(#15) DECLARATION of Alexander Ramirez in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#14

(#14) DECLARATION of Grevil Martinez in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Luis Martinez in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#12

(#12) DECLARATION of Jacob Aronauer in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#11

(#11) FIRST MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#10

(#10) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Jacob Aronauer dated 11/03/2020 re: Conditional Certification. Document filed by Luis Martinez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JVA Industries Inc. waiver sent on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. Document filed by Luis Martinez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on December 9, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Counsel for Plaintiffs is ordered to notify Defendants of this Notice. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/23/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JVA Industries Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Alfano..(jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JVA Industries Inc., re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Alfano, re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#3

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JVA Industries Inc., re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#1

(#3) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Joseph Alfano, JVA Industries Inc..Document filed by Grevil Martinez, Luis Martinez, Alexander Ramirez. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter John Koulikourdis on behalf of Joseph Alfano, JVA Industries Inc...(Koulikourdis, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DECLARATION of Alexander Ramirez in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Grevil Martinez in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DECLARATION of Luis Martinez in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) DECLARATION of Jacob Aronauer in Support re: #11 FIRST MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Jacob Aronauer dated 11/03/2020 re: Conditional Certification. Document filed by Luis Martinez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. JVA Industries Inc. waiver sent on 9/28/2020, answer due 11/27/2020. Document filed by Luis Martinez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on December 9, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. Counsel for Plaintiffs is ordered to notify Defendants of this Notice. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/23/2020) (ama) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to JVA Industries Inc...(jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph Alfano..(jgo) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JVA Industries Inc., re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Alfano, re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Joseph Alfano, JVA Industries Inc..Document filed by Grevil Martinez, Luis Martinez, Alexander Ramirez. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Joseph Alfano, JVA Industries Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21850236)Document filed by Grevil Martinez, Luis Martinez, Alexander Ramirez..(Aronauer, Jacob) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less