This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/26/2021 at 07:46:40 (UTC).

Martinez et al v. Dean et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 Martinez filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Dean. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-02821

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ever Yovani Martinez

Bertha Rosas

Defendants

Stephen Dean

Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Heriberto Ricardo Ramos

Attorney at Heriberto Ramos & Associates, P.C.

Two Riverwaysuite 1770

Houston, TX 77056

Michelle Teresa Acosta

Attorney at Heriberto Ramos and Assoc

Two Riverwaysuite 1770

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Kent M Adams

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, LLP

909 Fannin, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77010

Brian Scott O'Rear

Attorney at Sheehy, Ware & Pappas, P.C.

909 Fannin Streetsuite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Attorney/Party List

1 #3

Index of State Court File

1 #4

Exhibit A - State Court File

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: Minute entry for proceedings before Judge Charles Eskridge. Initial conference. All parties present in person.The Court addressed the scheduling and docket control order and the joint discovery/case management plan. Dkts 6 & 8. The Court addressed the potential for settlement. When ready, the parties may request to be referred for a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Sam S. Sheldon, if desired. Appearances: Brian Scott O'Rear, Michelle Teresa Acosta. Ct Reporter: ERO. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Plaintiffs, filed.(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Acosta on behalf of Ever Yovani Martinez, Bertha Rosas, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., filed.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian O'Rear on behalf of Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., filed. (O'Rear, Brian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 11/16/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 06/14/2022. Deft Expert Report due by 07/14/2022. Discovery due by 08/30/2022. Mediation due by 11/15/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/29/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 09/29/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/15/2022. Docket Call set for 01/23/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (%(username)) (Entered: 9/13/2021) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to with Jury Demand by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., filed. (Adams, Kent) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., filed.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., filed.(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 157th Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-45393 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26961478) filed by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attorney/Party List, #3 Index of State Court File, #4 Exhibit A - State Court File)(Adams, Kent) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kent M. Adams