This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 08:00:45 (UTC).

Cecilia Martinez v. Mead Johnson and Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Cecilia Martinez filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Mead Johnson and Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00213

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cecilia Martinez

Defendant

Mead Johnson and Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Heikali

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Joshua Nassir

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Ruhandy Glezakos

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez, (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mead Johnson and Company, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez. upon Mead Johnson and Company, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Oscar Ramallo. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez. upon Mead Johnson and Company, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/3/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Oscar Ramallo. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Mead Johnson and Company, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (ghap) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez, (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32726903 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Cecilia Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Cecilia Martinez(pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less