This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2021 at 06:57:21 (UTC).

MARTINCIC et al v. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2020 MARTINCIC filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joy Flowers Conti and William S. Stickman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00958

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joy Flowers Conti

William S. Stickman

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Counter Defendants and Cross Claimants

YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL

MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.

BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.

BW/IP, INC.

UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION

SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY

COST COMPANY

SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO.

NOOTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC

ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.

CASHCO, INC.

RILEY POWER, INC.

APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

CLYDE UNION, INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.

704 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Shannan Cerrone

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

G. Richard Murphy

Attorney at Thomas, Thomas, & Hafer LLP

525 William Penn Place, 37Th Floor, Suite 3750

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Robert L Hogan

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson LLP

The Henry W. Oliver Building, 535 Smithfield Street, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Counter Defendant Attorney

Robert L Hogan

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson LLP

The Henry W. Oliver Building, 535 Smithfield Street, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Other Attorneys

Leif J. Ocheltree

Attorney at Goldberg, Persky & White, P.C.

11 Stanwix Street, Suite 1800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Jason T. Shipp

Attorney at Goldberg, Persky, Jennings & White

11 Stanwix Street, Suite 1800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Dennis F. Wolford

Attorney at Reed,Tosh, Wolford & Douglass

999 Third Street

Beaver, PA 15009

Joseph F. Butcher

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz P.L.L.C.

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000, The Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Abby K. Hahn

Patrick A. Hewitt

Attorney at Riley, Hewitt Witte & Romano, P.C.

650 Washington Road, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

Francis J. Stanek

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC

11 Grandview Circle, Suite 200

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Edward A. Smallwood

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo, LLP

603 Stanwix Street, 10Th Floor, Two Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Elizabeth K. Wiese

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote, P.C.

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Paul K. Vey

Attorney at Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP

One Oxford Centre, 38Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Matthew Wimer

Attorney at Wimer Law Offices, P.C

333 Pennsylvania Avenue

Oakmont, PA 15139

Joseph R. Schaper

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley Anderson & Tardy

100 West Station Square Drive, The Landmarks Building, Ste 250

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

David Emil Lamm

Attorney at Pietragallo Gordon Alfano Bosick & Raspanti, LLP

One Oxford Centre, 38Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Joni M. Mangino

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000, The Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Christopher T. Yoskosky

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Matthew G. Chapman

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson

535 Smithfield Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Alison R. Viola

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

89 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#467

#466

#465

RESTRICTED

#464

#463

#462

#459

#69

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Exhibit A--Scott Complaint

#4

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

#2

467 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#467) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J. Verdream on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY AIRPORT AUTHORITY. (Verdream, Brandon) (Entered: 10/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRecord complete for Appeal purposes. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified copy of the docket entries. (ma) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#466) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #464 Notice of Appeal, by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. Transcripts ordered: None. (Wolford, Dennis) Modified on 10/22/2020 (ma). (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#465) USCA Case Number 20-3068 for #464 Notice of Appeal, filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. USCA Case Manager James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk3) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#464) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #463 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. Filing fee $505, receipt number APAWDC-5979702. Certificate of Appealability n/a. Court Reporter(s): n/a. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Wolford, Dennis) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#463) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Remand to State Court. This matter is REMANDED back to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/01/20. (eca) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#462) MEMORANDUM OPINION on #3 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/01/20. (eca) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #69 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2020. (ma) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #459 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2020. (ma) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#461) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GG OF FLORIDA, INC.. (Schollaert, John) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
468 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay of Proceedings by INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, TRANE U.S. INC. (Smallwood, Edward) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Disclosure Statement identifying Foster Wheeler AG (Switzerland), Foster Wheeler Ltd. (Bermuda), Foster Wheeler Holdings Ltd. (Bermuda), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Delaware), and FMR LLC as corporate parents or other affiliates, by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis) Modified on 7/2/2020 (ma). (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Johnston, J.) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Clements, Scott) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Clements, Scott) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID MARTINCIC, MERL WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Scott Complaint) (Shipp, Jason) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by DAVID MARTINCIC, MERL WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jason) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Shipp on behalf of DAVID MARTINCIC, MERL WILLIAMS. (Shipp, Jason) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-005567 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5717480), filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NOOTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CASHCO, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COST COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY is a litigant