Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 09:29:51 (UTC).

Martin v. Valero Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 Martin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Valero Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Donna Phillips Currault. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00660

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bridgette Martin

Defendants

John Jacob Baltz

Valero Services, Inc.

Jace Raney

ABC Insurance Company

Valero Refining-Meraux LLC

Unidentified Party

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin McCarthy Chopin

Attorney at Chopin Law Firm LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Michael Letourneau

Attorney at The Chopin Law Firm, LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard A Chopin

Attorney at The Chopin Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 1550

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Roland M. Vandenweghe, Jr.

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

Taylor Edward Brett

Attorney at Adams & Reese, LLP (New Orleans)

701 Poydras St., Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Valero Refining-Meraux LLC re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#26

(#26) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bridgette Martin re #24 MOTION to Strike #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court , Exhibit A (Affidavit of Bridgette Martin) . (Chopin, Richard) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

24 #1

Memorandum in Support

18 #5

Proposed Order

18 #4

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

18 #3

Exhibit B

18 #2

Exhibit A

18 #1

Memorandum in Support

#18

(#18) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bridgette Martin. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)(Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G - State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #6

Exhibit F - Notice of Consent to Removal

1 #5

Exhibit E - Notice of Consent to Removal

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Consent to Removal

1 #3

Affidavit Exhibit C

1 #2

Affidavit Exhibit B

1 #1

State Court Pleadings Exhibit A

#1

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's Petition for Damages for Intentional Tort by Jace Raney.(Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Valero Refining-Meraux LLC re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bridgette Martin re #24 MOTION to Strike #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court , Exhibit A (Affidavit of Bridgette Martin) . (Chopin, Richard) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER dismissing #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #23 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/12/21. (jrc) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Strike #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court , Exhibit A (Affidavit of Bridgette Martin) by Valero Refining-Meraux LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss by John Jacob Baltz. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICED regarding oral argument re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. By Clerk.(jrc) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Bridgette Martin regarding #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chopin, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Bridgette Martin re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Chopin, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Bridgette Martin regarding #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chopin, Richard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Bridgette Martin. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)(Letourneau, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's Petition for Damages for Intentional Tort by Jace Raney.(Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Valero Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Services, Inc. (Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's Petition for Damages for Intentional Tort by Valero Services, Inc..(Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Valero Refining-Meraux LLC identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Refining-Meraux LLC (Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, Plaintiff's Petition for Damages for Intentional Tort by Valero Refining-Meraux LLC.(Brett, Taylor) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 4/2/2021. (NEF: Judge Currault)(ajn) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. State Court Pleadings was image as 8-1/2 x 14. All documents should be 8-1/2 x 11. Clerk has corrected the image. (lt) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Valero Refining-Meraux LLC. (lt) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 34th JDC for St. Bernard Parish, case number 21-0198, Div. A (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8798362) filed by Valero Refining-Meraux LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Consent to Removal, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Roland M. Vandenweghe, Jr added to party Valero Refining-Meraux LLC (pty:dft).(Vandenweghe, Roland) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/2/2021) (lt). Modified text on 4/2/2021 (lt). (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Valero Refining & Marketing Co is a litigant

Latest cases where Valero Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC Insurance Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard A Chopin