This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:28:58 (UTC).

MARTIN v. SUTTON et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by MARTIN against SUTTON in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17070

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Zahid N. Quraishi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN

Defendants

CARETHA WILLIAMS

SUNTUITY SOLAR COMPNAY

DONALD SUTTON

CRYSTAL INN HOTEL

JEFFREY NORRIS

STATE OF NEW JERSEY GOVERNOR

ARNEAK TORRELL RICHARDSON

SUNTUITY SOLAR COMPANY

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER that this matter shall be reopened; Plaintiff's second application to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is hereby GRANTED; the Complaint shall be filed; SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE at this time, as the Court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff by regular U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/09/2019. (jem) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Submission received by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claims, #2 Subpoena to Produce Documents)(jdb) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. IFP Status. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (jem) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

1 #1

Application IFP

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Envelope

#11

RESTRICTED

6 #2

Subpoena to Produce Documents

5 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) ORDER Denying #1 IFP Application, this matter is Administratively Terminated. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen the matter she shall notify the Court in writing along with a completed IFP Application or the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/9/2019. ***Blank IFP Application mailed to Plaintiff. (km) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE and Statement of Claims by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (jem) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(abr) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#7

(#7) STATEMENT OF CLAIMS filed by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (jmh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

3 #1

Envelope

6 #1

Statement of Claims

#12

(#12) Exhibit to #10 Notice of Appeal (USCA), by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (jem) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Court of Appeals that #12 Exhibit was filed on 10/18/2019 in reference to Notice of Appeal. (jem) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Exhibit to #10 Notice of Appeal (USCA), by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (jem) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) USCA Case Number 19-3370 for #10 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (lr) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. IFP Status. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (jem) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE and Statement of Claims by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (jem) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT filed; see docket entry #1 .(jem) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER that this matter shall be reopened; Plaintiff's second application to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is hereby GRANTED; the Complaint shall be filed; SUMMONS SHALL NOT ISSUE at this time, as the Court's sua sponte screening has not yet been completed; the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff by regular U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/09/2019. (jem) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATEMENT OF CLAIMS filed by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (jmh) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Submission received by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claims, #2 Subpoena to Produce Documents)(jdb) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (km) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Denying #1 IFP Application, this matter is Administratively Terminated. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen the matter she shall notify the Court in writing along with a completed IFP Application or the $400.00 filing fee. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/9/2019. ***Blank IFP Application mailed to Plaintiff. (km) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Submission Received by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Submission received by TEKEEMA TOCCARA MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(jdb) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(abr) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.