This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2022 at 10:15:31 (UTC).

Martin v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 Martin filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Daniel C. Irick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01102

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Steven Martin

Defendants

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yazen A. Abdin

Attorney at Abdin Law

5401 S Kirkman Rd, Suite 105

Orlando, FL 32819

 

Court Documents

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/29/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketFEES Paid by Steven Martin (Filing fee $402.00, Receipt Number ORL104271). (KNC) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Steven Martin. Related cases: no. (Abdin, Yazen) Text modified on 7/1/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Initial Case Order by Steven Martin. (Abdin, Yazen) Text modified on 7/1/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/29/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants and the U.S. Attorney. (RDO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Steven Martin. Related case(s): No (RDO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Steven Martin. (RDO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Writ of Mandamus and/or Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by Steven Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(RDO) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant