This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2021 at 09:41:48 (UTC).

Martin v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 Martin filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Willie J. Epps, Jr and Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04137

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Willie J. Epps, Jr

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clifford Martin

Defendants

Life Insurance Company of North America

Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Talia Ravis

9229 Ward Parkway, Suite 370

Kansas City, MO 64114

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Leopold

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

William E. Hanna

Attorney at Stinson LLP - KC 2900

1201 Walnut St., Ste. 2900

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Clifford Martin. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#14

(#14) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Phil Miller(Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America.(Leopold, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION of dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#9

(#9) Proposed scheduling order due by 9/13/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 9/7/2021. Signed on 08/23/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of Defendants Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America.(Leopold, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Leopold, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clifford Martin. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 08/04/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Talia Ravis on behalf of Clifford Martin. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7498484. Service due by 10/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ravis, Talia) Modified on 7/16/2021: Attachment 1, Civil Cover Sheet, replaced. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Clifford Martin. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Phil Miller(Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America.(Leopold, Christopher) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Pursuant to the Parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, Doc. #11 , all claims against Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and fees directly related to the dismissal. Signed on 08/26/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Vandegriff, Joseph) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION of dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' motion for extension of time, Doc. #7 , is granted. Defendants have until September 7, 2021, to file their answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, Doc. #1 . Signed on 8/23/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Vandegriff, Joseph) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed scheduling order due by 9/13/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 9/7/2021. Signed on 08/23/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of Defendants Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America.(Leopold, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher J. Leopold on behalf of Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Leopold added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Leopold, Christopher) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clifford Martin. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (Ravis, Talia) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 08/04/2021 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This case number shall now read 2:21-cv-04137-NKL. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to Jason Incorporated Salaried Long Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 7/16/2021 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (VanGerpen, Lindsay) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/6/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Talia Ravis on behalf of Clifford Martin. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7498484. Service due by 10/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ravis, Talia) Modified on 7/16/2021: Attachment 1, Civil Cover Sheet, replaced. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jason is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant