This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2021 at 11:15:57 (UTC).

MARTIN v. KNIGHT

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 MARTIN filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against KNIGHT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00589

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KEONIE T. MARTIN

Pendleton, IN 46064

Respondent

WENDY KNIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Abigail T. Rom

Attorney at INDIANA ATTORNEY GENERAL

Indiana Government Center South, 5Th Floor, 302 West Washington St.

Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by WENDY KNIGHT. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 6/4/2021. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail T. Rom on behalf of Respondent WENDY KNIGHT. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - The petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. ( Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2021.) Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/12/2021.(MAC) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

2 #1

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner KEONIE T. MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(AKH) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Cover Pages

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KEONIE T. MARTIN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Pages, #2 Envelope). (AKH) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by WENDY KNIGHT. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 6/4/2021. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Abigail T. Rom on behalf of Respondent WENDY KNIGHT. (Rom, Abigail) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - The petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #2 , is granted. The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. ( Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2021.) Copy to Petitioner via U.S. Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 3/12/2021.(MAC) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner KEONIE T. MARTIN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope).(AKH) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KEONIE T. MARTIN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Cover Pages, #2 Envelope). (AKH) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abigail T. Rom