This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2020 at 12:21:37 (UTC).

Martin v. HESS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 Martin filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HESS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are George W. Cannon, Jr and Wilma A. Lewis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Telbert Martin

Defendants

HESS CORPORATION

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Korey A Nelson

Attorney at Burns and Charest LLP

Defendant Attorneys

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

Robert J. Kuczynski

Attorney at Law Office Of Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

1 #4

Exhibit Ex. D

1 #3

Exhibit Ex. C

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. B

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRYRe: #11 Docket Annotation was file incorrectly in St. Croix case instead of St Thomas. Document re-file in correct case. (TNS) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Oath (GWC) of Attorney Admitted Pro Hac Vice of Anna J. Schaffner. (TNS) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (WAL) dated 09/24/2020. ORDER ACCEPTING Plaintiff's #9 Notice of Dismissal and directing the Clerk of Court to mark this case CLOSED. (TLS) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Telbert Martin (Nelson, Korey) (Entered: 09/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Korey A Nelson on behalf of Plaintiff Telbert Martin (Nelson, Korey) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER (GWC) dated 9/3/2020 UPON CONSIDERATION of #6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading(s) (Hess & HONYC), it is now hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and, it is further ORDERED that Defendants Hess Corporation and Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp., now merged with and into Hess Oil New York Corp. (HONYC), shall have an extension of time up to and including Wednesday, September 30, 2020, in which to file and serve their responsive pleading(s) to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (KMD) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer /Responsive Pleading(s) by Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Kuczynski, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendant HESS CORPORATION (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Kuczynski on behalf of Defendant Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Kuczynski, Robert) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing by HESS CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant HESS CORPORATION from Superior Court, District of St. Croix, case number SX-20-CV-592. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-880875)filed by HESS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HESS OIL VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Kuczynski