This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2020 at 07:33:59 (UTC).

Martin v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/27/2019 Martin filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lanny King. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00188

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lanny King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paula J. Martin

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mary G. Burchett-Bower

Attorney at Burchett Law Firm

107 N. Public Square

Glasgow, KY 42141

Defendant Attorney

Timothy D. Thompson

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Paula J. Martin as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Burchett-Bower, Mary) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 1/17/2020. (MNM) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Lanny King. (MNM) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-3010430, filed by Paula J. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.