This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 07:45:33 (UTC).

Martin v. Chess Well Service, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Martin filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Chess Well Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Karen L Hayes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Karen L Hayes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Martin

Defendants

Specialty Risk Associates, Inc.

Chess Well Service, LLC

Specialty Risk Associates Inc

Chess Well Service L L C

American Alternative Insurance Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard M Martin, Jr

Attorney at Lamothe Law Firm (NO)

400 Poydras St Ste 1760

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

Randell E Treadaway

Attorney at Zaunbrecher Treadaway (COV)

406 N Florida St Ste 2

Covington, LA 70433

Brett M Bollinger

Attorney at Zaunbrecher Treadaway (COV)

406 N Florida St Ste 2

Covington, LA 70433

Jeffrey E McDonald

Attorney at Zaunbrecher Treadaway (COV)

406 N Florida St Ste 2

Covington, LA 70433

Larry Peter Englande, Jr

Attorney at Zaunbrecher Treadaway (COV)

406 N Florida St Ste 2

Covington, LA 70433

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/13/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/28/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Alternative Insurance Corp identifying Corporate Parent Munich Re America Corp and Munich Reinsurance Co for American Alternative Insurance Corp. (aty,McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/20/2019 to add other affiliate (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Alternative Insurance Corp, Chess Well Service L L C.(Attorney Jeffrey E McDonald added to party American Alternative Insurance Corp and Chess Well Service L L C(pty:dft))(aty,McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/20/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Martin. American Alternative Insurance Corp served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#11

(#11) JUDGMENT granting #10 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Specialty Risk Association Inc are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/5/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

10 #1

Proposed order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Phillip Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Martin, Richard) Modified entry to more accurately identify pleading on 2/5/2019. (Crick, S). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard M Martin, Jr on behalf of Phillip Martin regarding #6 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Specialty Risk Associates, Inc.. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

8 #2

Proposed order

8 #1

Proposed pleading

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages with consent by Phillip Martin. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Alternative Insurance Corp. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#6

(#6) DEFICIENT. VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Specialty Risk Associates, Inc. by Phillip Martin. (aty,Martin, Richard) Modified on 2/4/2019 to indicate deficiency (FinnSld, P). Modified on 2/5/2019 to indicate #10 Motion to Dismiss resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Alternative Insurance Corp. with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Martin.(aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

1 #3

Proposed summons/writ

1 #2

Proposed summons/writ

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chess Well Service, LLC, Specialty Risk Associates, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3854364) filed by Phillip Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Richard M Martin, Jr added to party Phillip Martin(pty:pla))(aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/13/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/28/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Alternative Insurance Corp identifying Corporate Parent Munich Re America Corp and Munich Reinsurance Co for American Alternative Insurance Corp. (aty,McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/20/2019 to add other affiliate (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Alternative Insurance Corp, Chess Well Service L L C.(Attorney Jeffrey E McDonald added to party American Alternative Insurance Corp and Chess Well Service L L C(pty:dft))(aty,McDonald, Jeffrey) Modified on 2/20/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Martin. American Alternative Insurance Corp served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Corrective Action to Richard M Martin, Jr on behalf of Phillip Martin regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages with consent . Action taken: Terminated #8 Motion for Leave as the Amended Complaint was previously filed at #5 Amended Complaint. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JUDGMENT granting #10 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Specialty Risk Association Inc are Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/5/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Corrective Action to Richard M Martin, Jr on behalf of Phillip Martin regarding #6 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Specialty Risk Associates, Inc.. Action taken: Terminated #6 Motion to Dismiss. #10 Motion to Dismiss resubmitted in its entirety. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Phillip Martin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Martin, Richard) Modified entry to more accurately identify pleading on 2/5/2019. (Crick, S). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Deficiency to Richard M Martin, Jr on behalf of Phillip Martin regarding #6 JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Specialty Risk Associates, Inc.. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages with consent by Phillip Martin. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Alternative Insurance Corp. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEFICIENT. VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss Specialty Risk Associates, Inc. by Phillip Martin. (aty,Martin, Richard) Modified on 2/4/2019 to indicate deficiency (FinnSld, P). Modified on 2/5/2019 to indicate #10 Motion to Dismiss resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Alternative Insurance Corp. with Jury Demand filed by Phillip Martin.(aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Martin. Specialty Risk Associates Inc served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Martin. Chess Well Service L L C served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chess Well Service L L C, Specialty Risk Associates Inc (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,FinnSld, P) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Chess Well Service, LLC, Specialty Risk Associates, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3854364) filed by Phillip Martin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Richard M Martin, Jr added to party Phillip Martin(pty:pla))(aty,Martin, Richard) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less