This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/12/2022 at 06:02:37 (UTC).

Martin Reiner v. Michael Nakhleh et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 Martin Reiner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michael Nakhleh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish, Consuelo B. Marshall, Percy Anderson and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00528

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Gail J. Standish

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judges

Consuelo B. Marshall

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martin Reiner

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendants

Joseph Adams

Rancho Mall LLC

Jenny Hua

Does 1 to 10

Vickie Grasu

Anastacia Osbrink

Elias Nakhleh

Travelers Insurance Company

Kimberly Howatt

Elite Restaurant Group, Inc.

O'Hagan Meyer

Brookfield Properties Inc

QIC US Management Inc.

William O'Hare

Michael Nakhleh

Allison Jones

Elizabeth Weldon

Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Christy D Joseph

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Jing Hua

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

William S O'Hare, Jr

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-7689

Elizabeth M Weldon

Attorney at Snell and Wilmer LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Kevin W Alexander

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jessica Wynette Rosen

Attorney at Lewitt Hackman Shapiro Marshall and Harlan

16633 Ventura Boulevard Suite 11Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436

Steven L Feldman

Attorney at Lewitt Hackman SHapiro Marshall and Harlan

16633 Ventura Boulevard 11Th Floor

Encino, CA 91436

Bruce T Smyth

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

11755 Wilshire Bouelvard, Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Andrew J Waxler

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck LLP

11755 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

28 #11

Proof fo Service

28 #9

Declaration of Kevin ALexander and Exhibit H

28 #8

Exhibit G

28 #6

Exhibit E

28 #5

Exhibit D

28 #4

Exhibit C

28 #3

Exhibit B

28 #2

Exhibit A

28 #1

Request for Judicial Notice

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#2

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#52) JUDGMENT by Judge Percy Anderson, Related to: Order on Motion to Quash, Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, #51 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 1. This action is dismissed with prejudice; and 2. Plaintiff shall take nothing and Defendants are entitled to their costs of suit pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (mrgo) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • Docket(#51) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) re ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. For the reasons stated above, the Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against remaining defendants Geoff Lee, Kimberly Howatt, Allison Jones, Anastacia Osbrink, and Traveler's Insurance Company with prejudice. The Motion to Quash filed by defendants Geoff Lee, Kimberly Howatt, Allison Jones, and Anastacia Osbrink (Dkt. No. 27) is denied as moot. In addition, the Motion to Dismiss filed by defendant Traveler's Insurance Company (Dkt. No. 45) is denied as moot. The Court will issue a judgment consistent with this Order. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#50) RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #49 filed by Plaintiff Martin Reiner. (lom) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(#49) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause, in writing, no later than Tuesday, June 8, 2021, why the Court's order granting Gordon Rees' Motion to Dismiss should not apply to the remaining Defendants in this action. (iv) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss. Based on the above, the Court grants Moving Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In addition the Court finds Plaintiff's Complaint cannot be saved through amendment. See Lopez v. Smith, 203 F.3d 1122, 1129 (9th Cir. 2000) ("Courts are not require to grant leave to amend if a complaint lacks merit entirely."); See Kinnard, 2014 WL 1465693, at *4 (denying leave to amend similar Section 1985(2) claim based on litigation tactics finding amendment would be futile). Thus, Plaintiff's claims against Moving Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Martin Reiner pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Mazyar Yaghoubian. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Martin Reiner pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Joseph Adams, Brookfield Properties Inc, Jenny Hua, William O'Hare, Christine Pham, QIC US Management Inc., Rancho Mall LLC, Snell & Wilmer LLP, Elizabeth Weldon. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Travelers Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 6/28/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Smyth ISO Mtn to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Dismissal) (Waxler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 5/26/2021.) (mrgo) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) IN CHAMBERS ORDER TAKING MOTION UNDER ADVISEMENT by Judge Percy Anderson. A hearing on the Motion to Quash Service #27 and Motion to Dismiss Complaint #28 is scheduled for May 24, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 7-15, the Court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for May 24, 2021, is vacated and the matter taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Martin Reiner pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) With Prejudice as to Vickie Grasu, O'Hagan Meyer. (Grasu, Vickie) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-05734 PA(MAAx). Case transferred from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00528 PA(MAAx). Signed by Judge Percy Anderson (rn) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 3:20-cv-02539 TWR-AHG, from Southern District of California. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-00528 CBM (GJSx). (esa) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Southern (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred to District of United States District Court for the Central District of California, Western Division. Files transferred electronically to: *United States District Court for the Central District of California, Western Division*.*350 West 1st Street STE 4311, 4th Floor**Los Angeles, CA 90012-4565*. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 1/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jmr) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 1/20/2021.] (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/20/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Joseph Adams, Brookfield Properties Inc., DOES 1 to 10, Elite Restaurant Group, Inc., Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP, Vickie Grasu, Kimberly Howatt, Jenny Hua, Allison Jones, Geoff Lee, O'Hagan Meyer, Elias Nakhleh, Michael Nakhleh, William O'Hare, Anastacia Osbrink, Christine Pham, QIC US Management Inc., Rancho Mall LLC, Slater's 50/50 Franchise LLC, Snell & Wilmer LLP, Travelers Insurance Company, Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC, Elizabeth Weldon, Mazyar Yaghoubian ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number CAS126587.), filed by Martin Reiner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2539-AHG. Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard is assigned to the case.(smd) [Transferred from California Southern on 1/20/2021.] (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANCHO MALL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Slater's 50/50 Franchise, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Brookfield Properties Inc. is a litigant