This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:47:54 (UTC).

Martin et al v. Thor Motor Coach Inc

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Martin filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Thor Motor Coach Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Damon R Leichty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00013

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Terri Martin

Clarence Martin

Defendant

Thor Motor Coach Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amorette Rinkleib

Attorney at THOMPSON CONSUMER LAW GROUP, PLLC

5235 E Southern Ave, D106-618

Mesa, AZ 85206

Defendant Attorneys

Vicki M. Smith

Attorney at Bodyfelt Mount, LLP

319 Sw Washington Street, Suite 1200

Portland, OR 97204

Trevor Q Gasper

Attorney at Thor Industries Inc

601 E Beardsley Ave

Elkhart, IN 46514

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) NOTICE by Thor Motor Coach Inc re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion Served 3/5/2020) (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

20 #2

Exhibit B - Limited Warranty

20 #1

Exhibit A - Affidavit of Celina Tyler

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Celina Tyler, #2 Exhibit B - Limited Warranty)(Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#19

(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Vicki M. Smith by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01510. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/19/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#5

(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Thor Motor Coach Inc (Smith, Vicki) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND Attorney Vicki M Smith added to party Thor Motor Coach Inc(pty:dft) by Thor Motor Coach Inc.(Smith, Vicki) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#3

(#3) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc on 10/4/2019 (Rinkleib, Amorette) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/23/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - RISC

#1

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND Attorney Vicki M Smith added to party Thor Motor Coach Inc(pty:dft) by Thor Motor Coach Inc.(Smith, Vicki) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE by Thor Motor Coach Inc re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Motion Served 3/5/2020) (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM in Support of #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Celina Tyler, #2 Exhibit B - Limited Warranty)(Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Vicki M. Smith terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/27/20. (slm) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Vicki M. Smith by Defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Q Gasper on behalf of Thor Motor Coach Inc (Gasper, Trevor) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01510. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Motion terminated: #13 Stipulated MOTION to Transfer Case Venue per entry of #14 Order transferring case. Per direction of chambers, the Clerk is directed to transfer case to the Northern District of Indiana without waiting the 15 day period to expire. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Case will be sent to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division, by electronic transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting Defendant's #9 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court, Northern District of Indiana, South Bend Division. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Change Venue Oral Argument Requested, filed by Defendant Thor Motor Coach, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/27/2019, (Smith, Vicki) Modified on 12/5/2019 to add name of filer (PM). [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 12/27/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 12/13/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/20/2019, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Marsha J. Pechman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge David W. Christel no longer assigned to case, by Clerk, William M McCool. (KEB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 11/19/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KEB) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Thor Industries, Inc. for Thor Motor Coach Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Thor Motor Coach Inc (Smith, Vicki) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND Attorney Vicki M Smith added to party Thor Motor Coach Inc(pty:dft) by Thor Motor Coach Inc.(Smith, Vicki) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc on 10/4/2019 (Rinkleib, Amorette) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Thor Motor Coach Inc. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Judge David W. Christel added. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Thor Motor Coach Inc with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5934445), filed by Clarence Martin, Terri Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rinkleib, Amorette) [Transferred from Washington Western on 1/6/2020.] (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.