This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2020 at 10:38:00 (UTC).

Martin et al v. Siever et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Martin filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Siever. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller and Raymond A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00250

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judge

Raymond A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

S. Hurley

Waverly, VA 23891

K. Belcher

Waverly, VA 23891

D. Williams

Waverly, VA 23891

Mallik Black

Waverly, VA 23891

R. Ellerbee

Waverly, VA 23891

V. Squire

Waverly, VA 23891

M. Carver

Waverly, VA 23891

William C. Taylor

Waverly, VA 23891

Kenneth Floyd

Waverly, VA 23891

J. Riley

Waverly, VA 23891

Joshua Deranek

Waverly, VA 23891

Joseph Belvin

Waverly, VA 23891

Raheem Brown

Waverly, VA 23891

Shane Taylor

Waverly, VA 23891

T. Stokes

Waverly, VA 23891

C. Sherman

Waverly, VA 23891

Shonta Thorne

Waverly, VA 23891

Defendants

Ivan Gilmore

Mr. Daniels

Travis Siever

7 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

10 #3

Envelope

10 #2

Letter

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) Declaration in Support re #1 Complaint by Sidney P. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Submission by Plaintiff Shane Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to T.Mitchell re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to K. Belcher re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Demetri Farrell re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kenneth Floyd re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Mr. Daniels, Ivan Gilmore, Travis Siever (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Shane Taylor, K. Belcher, Raheem Brown, William C. Taylor, M. Carver, R. Ellerbee, Sidney P. Martin, T. Tower, D. Williams, Shonta Thorne, S. Hurley, C. Sherman, Ronald Mack, Demetri Farrell, J. Riley, S. Worrell, J. White-K, V. Squire, Kenneth Floyd, Mallik Black, T. Mitchell, Joshua Deranek, T. Stokes, Joseph Belvin. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (No service copies provided.)(jmey, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Declaration in Support re #1 Complaint by Sidney P. Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Submission by Plaintiff Shane Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by V. Belcher. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(jmey, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to T.Mitchell re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to K. Belcher re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to C. Sherman re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Demetri Farrell re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kenneth Floyd re #2 . (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Mr. Daniels, Ivan Gilmore, Travis Siever (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Shane Taylor, K. Belcher, Raheem Brown, William C. Taylor, M. Carver, R. Ellerbee, Sidney P. Martin, T. Tower, D. Williams, Shonta Thorne, S. Hurley, C. Sherman, Ronald Mack, Demetri Farrell, J. Riley, S. Worrell, J. White-K, V. Squire, Kenneth Floyd, Mallik Black, T. Mitchell, Joshua Deranek, T. Stokes, Joseph Belvin. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (No service copies provided.)(jmey, ) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MR. DANIELS INC. DBA BLAKESLEE RECORDING COMPANY is a litigant