This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:29:40 (UTC).

Martin et al v. Carico International Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Martin filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Carico International Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02233

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wallace Martin

Erin Martin

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Carico International Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Antranig N. Garibian

Attorney at Garibian Law Offices, P.C.

1010 Bancroft Parkway, Suite 22

Wilmington, DE 19805

Defendant Attorney

Karen M. Grivner

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

824 N. Market Street, Suite 710

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to 2/2/2020 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen) Modified on 1/15/2020 (nms). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin Martin, Wallace Martin. Carico International Corporation served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin Martin, Wallace Martin. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Carico International Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2794573.) - filed by Erin Martin, Wallace Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Letter to Judge Richard Andrews, from Antranig Garibian, regarding status. (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 1/8/2020 (nms). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Reissued - mailed per counsels request - with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Carico International Corporation. (apk) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to 2/2/2020 (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 2/2/2020). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/15/2020. (nms) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer the Complaint to 2/2/2020 - filed by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Grivner, Karen) Modified on 1/15/2020 (nms). (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter to Judge Richard Andrews, from Antranig Garibian, regarding status. (Garibian, Antranig) Modified on 1/8/2020 (nms). (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORAL ORDER: Answers were due to be filed on 1/2/2020 (see D.I. #3 ; D.I. #4 ), and to date none have been filed. Now the Plaintiff shall file a status letter within 3 days from the entry of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/6/2020. (nms) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin Martin, Wallace Martin. Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Erin Martin, Wallace Martin. Carico International Corporation served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Garibian, Antranig) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Carico International Corporation on 12/6/2019; Equifax Information Services, LLC on 12/6/2019. Summons mailed to requesting attorney's Philadelphia office. (kmd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (kmd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Carico International Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2794573.) - filed by Erin Martin, Wallace Martin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmd) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.