This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2021 at 07:42:41 (UTC).

MARSHALL v. ROWE ROOFING INC

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 MARSHALL filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against ROWE ROOFING INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L HINKLE and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00394

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oz Marshall

Defendants

Rowe Roofing, Inc.

ROWE ROOFING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOAH E STORCH

Attorney at RICHARD CELLER LEGAL PA - DAVIE FL

10368 W State Road 84, Suite 103

Davie, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

ADAM COLBY LOSEY

Attorney at LOSEY PLLC - ORLANDO FL

1420 Edgewater Drive

Orlando, FL 32804

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to ROWE ROOFING INC. (kjw) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (STORCH, NOAH) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#5

(#5) PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (STORCH, NOAH) Modified to edit title on 10/12/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by OZ MARSHALL. ROWE ROOFING INC served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (STORCH, NOAH) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#7

(#7) DEFENDANT ROWE ROOFING, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF OZ MARSHALL'S COMPLAINT. (LOSEY, ADAM) Modified to edit title on 11/2/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#8

(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER.Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/17/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2021. Discovery due by 7/5/2022. Attorney Conference due by 12/6/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/03/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. The defendant's unopposed motion, ECF No. #7 , to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint is granted. The deadline is extended to 11/15/2021. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/03/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ROWE ROOFING INC. (LOSEY, ADAM) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#11

(#11) DEFENDANT ROWE ROOFING, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (LOSEY, ADAM) Modified to edit title on 11/16/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

11 #1

Exhibit A

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFENDANT ROWE ROOFING, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (LOSEY, ADAM) Modified to edit title on 11/16/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ROWE ROOFING INC. (LOSEY, ADAM) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. The defendant's unopposed motion, ECF No. #7 , to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint is granted. The deadline is extended to 11/15/2021. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/03/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER.Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/17/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/20/2021. Discovery due by 7/5/2022. Attorney Conference due by 12/6/2021. Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/03/2021. (rcb) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFENDANT ROWE ROOFING, INC.'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF OZ MARSHALL'S COMPLAINT. (LOSEY, ADAM) Modified to edit title on 11/2/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by OZ MARSHALL. ROWE ROOFING INC served on 10/11/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (STORCH, NOAH) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons (rcb)**An ISO is needed** (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (STORCH, NOAH) Modified to edit title on 10/12/2021 (rcb). (Entered: 10/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (STORCH, NOAH) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint filed by NOAH STORCH ATTORNEY NOAH STORCH is advised by this entry, that a Civil Cover Sheet must be filed as a separate entry using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings" under "Other Documents". PLEASE RE-FILE THE CIVIL COVER SHEET. (rcb) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ROWE ROOFING INC. (kjw) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rowe Roofing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6347390.), filed by Oz Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (STORCH, NOAH) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Colby Losey