This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 08:01:03 (UTC).

Dezzi Marshall v. Red Lobster Management LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Dezzi Marshall filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Red Lobster Management LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04786

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dezzi Rae Marshall

Defendants

Red Lobster Restaurants LLC

Red Lobster Hospitality LLC

Red Lobster Management LLC

Red Lobster Seafood Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew D Strugar

Attorney at Law Office of Matthew Strugar

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 2910

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Jay R Shooster

535 Mission Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Seafood Co., LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Restaurants LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Management LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Hospitality LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Red Lobster Hospitality LLC, Red Lobster Management LLC, Red Lobster Restaurants LLC, Red Lobster Seafood Co., LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall, (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31454042 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party Dezzi Rae Marshall(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Seafood Co., LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Restaurants LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Management LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. upon Red Lobster Hospitality LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/24/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. Waiver of Service signed by David H. Stern. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Red Lobster Hospitality LLC, Red Lobster Management LLC, Red Lobster Restaurants LLC, Red Lobster Seafood Co., LLC. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jay R. Shooster to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31454534) filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Certificate of Good Standing - D.C.) (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall, (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. (Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31454042 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Dezzi Rae Marshall. (Attorney Matthew D Strugar added to party Dezzi Rae Marshall(pty:pla))(Strugar, Matthew) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RED LOBSTER RESTAURANTS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RED LOBSTER HOSPITALITY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RED LOBSTER MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Daniel Strugar