This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2021 at 10:57:06 (UTC).

MARSHALL v. MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 MARSHALL filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANDA MARSHALL

Defendant

MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Ann DeLaney

Attorney at DELANEY & DELANEY LLC

3646 North Washington Blvd.

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Annavieve C. Conklin

Attorney at DELANEY & DELANEY LLC

3646 Washington Blvd.

Indianapolis, IN 46205

Daniel E. Gustafson

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Kenneth A. Wexler

Attorney at WEXLER WALLACE LLP

55 West Monroe Street Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Michelle Lukic

Attorney at WEXLER WALLAC LLP

55 W. Monroe Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60603

Mark J. Tamblyn

Attorney at WEXLER WALLACE LLP

333 University Ave, Ste 200

Sacramento, CA 95825

Raina C. Borrelli

Attorney at GUSTAFSON GLUEK PLLC

120 South Sixth Street, Suite 2600

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

16 #2

Text of Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit A - Certification of Kenneth A. Wexler

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

9 #1

Exhibit A - Certification of Raina C. Borrelli

#9

8 #2

Text of Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit A - Certification of Daniel E. Gustafson

#8

7 #1

Exhibit A - Certification of Michelle Lukic

#7

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS'MOTIONTO CONSOLIDATE CASES - The Clerk is DIRECTED to consolidate Cause Nos. 3:21-cv-00009-RLY-MPB, 3:21-cv-00014-RLY-MPB, 3:21-cv-00022-RLY-MPB, 1:21-cv-00360-JPH-TAB, and 3:21-cv-00050-RLY-MPB ("the consolidated actions") into Cause No. 3:21-cv-00007-RLY-MPB and close the other actions. The Clerk is FURTHER DIRECTED to docket this entry in the consolidated actions prior to their closure. No final judgment will issue in the consolidated actions. The Court directs that all future filings be made in 3:21-cv-00007-RLY-MPB. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/29/2021.(JRB) Modified on 3/30/2021 (JRB). (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kenneth A. Wexler for SHANDA MARSHALL added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/24/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Attorney(s) Kenneth A. Wexler to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6472440), filed by Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Kenneth A. Wexler, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN of Service, filed by SHANDA MARSHALL. MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC. served on 3/19/2021. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Joinder in Joint Motion to Consolidate and for Entry of Scheduling Order [related cases], filed by Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Raina C. Borrelli for SHANDA MARSHALL added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/19/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Daniel E. Gustafson for SHANDA MARSHALL added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/19/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michelle Lukic for SHANDA MARSHALL added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/19/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Mark J. Tamblyn for SHANDA MARSHALL added. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/19/2021. (JRB) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Attorney(s) 1 to Appear pro hac vice , Raina Borrelli (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6465676), filed by Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Raina C. Borrelli, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel E. Gustafson to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6465661), filed by Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Daniel E. Gustafson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Attorney(s) Michelle Lukic to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6465638), filed by Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Michelle Lukic, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark J. Tamblyn to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-6465609), filed by Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Mark J. Tamblyn, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC. (AAS) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Annavieve C. Conklin on behalf of Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL. (Conklin, Annavieve) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann DeLaney on behalf of Plaintiff SHANDA MARSHALL. (DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC., filed by SHANDA MARSHALL. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6461078) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FDA report, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(DeLaney, Kathleen) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIDWESTERN PET FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Lukic

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Annavieve C. Conklin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark J. Tamblyn