This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/13/2022 at 10:03:08 (UTC).

Marshall v. Lumpkin et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 Marshall filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lumpkin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles Marshall

Defendants

Devaughn Lumpkin

Old Republic Insurance Co

Schneider National Carriers Inc

R G S Trucking Inc

Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Geya Dawn Prudhomme

Attorney at Dudley DeBosier Injury Lawyers (SHV)

4300 Youree Dr Ste 250

Shreveport, LA 71105

Gerald Adam Savoie

Attorney at Dudley DeBosier Injury Lawyers (SHV)

4300 Youree Dr Ste 250

Shreveport, LA 71105

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Austin Love

Attorney at Dill Law Firm

825 Lafayette St

Lafayette, LA 70501

James M Dill

Attorney at Dill Law Firm

825 Lafayette St

Lafayette, LA 70501

Gerald M Johnson, Jr

Attorney at Lunn Irion et al

330 Marshall St Ste 500

Shreveport, LA 71101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 2nd JDC Jackson Parish, Case Number 36737 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5139848) filed by Schneider National Carriers Inc, Devaughn Lumpkin, Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Verification, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Gary Austin Love added to party Devaughn Lumpkin(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Austin Love added to party Old Republic Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Austin Love added to party Schneider National Carriers Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Love, Gary) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit Verification

1 #5

Civil cover sheet

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Republic Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Company. (aty,Love, Gary) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schneider National Carriers Inc identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Inc for Schneider National Carriers Inc. (aty,Love, Gary) Modified on 6/14/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/15/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#5

(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/16/2022. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Devaughn Lumpkin, Old Republic Insurance Co, Schneider National Carriers Inc . (aty,Love, Gary) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Devaughn Lumpkin, Old Republic Insurance Co, Schneider National Carriers Inc . (aty,Love, Gary) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/16/2022. (crt,Leday, A) (Entered: 06/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/15/2022. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by R G S Trucking Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #1 of document #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #1 of document #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Devaughn Lumpkin, Old Republic Insurance Co, Schneider National Carriers Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachment #1 of document #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schneider National Carriers Inc identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National Inc for Schneider National Carriers Inc. (aty,Love, Gary) Modified on 6/14/2022 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Republic Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation for Old Republic Insurance Company. (aty,Love, Gary) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 2nd JDC Jackson Parish, Case Number 36737 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5139848) filed by Schneider National Carriers Inc, Devaughn Lumpkin, Old Republic Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Verification, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Gary Austin Love added to party Devaughn Lumpkin(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Austin Love added to party Old Republic Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Gary Austin Love added to party Schneider National Carriers Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Love, Gary) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER NATIONAL CARRIERS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Old Republic Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Austin Love