This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2023 at 16:55:40 (UTC).

Marshall v. Collecto, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/08/2021 Marshall filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Collecto, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02585

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roger Marshall

Defendants

Collecto, Inc. doing business as EOS CCA

US Asset Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M. Barshay

Attorney at Barshay, Rizzo & Lopez, PLLC

445 Broadhollow Road, Suite Cl18

Melville, NY 11747

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Brady Johnson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

One Battery Park Plaza, 28Th Fl

New York City, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

2 #1

US Asset summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 US Asset summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Collecto, Inc. d/b/a EOS CCA, US Asset Management, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14452059 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Roger Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 05/08/2021)

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#6

#5

#4

#3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Court having been advised that this matter has settled, the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 45 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents if they are filed within this period. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/18/2021. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Settlement as to all Defendants by Collecto, Inc., US Asset Management, Inc. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Asset Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EOS Holdings (USA) Inc. for US Asset Management, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Collecto, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EOS Holdings (USA) Inc. for Collecto, Inc.. (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Brady Johnson on behalf of Collecto, Inc., US Asset Management, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Johnson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder re: #11 . This "joint letter" is wholly inadequate. Plaintiff's portion is inadequate because there are third parties to whom communication may be made. Plaintiff has not advised the Court who the third party is nor why the communication is not permitted under the statute. As to defendants, first of all, the letter does not disclose which of the two defendants counsel is representing. Nor does it disclose its role in the challenged transaction. The parties are directed to file a supplemental letter forthwith that says something; failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions on one or both sides under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(f). Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/17/2021. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter Joint Letter in connection with Initial Conference by Roger Marshall (Barshay, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder striking #10 . This is not a joint letter. Correspondence between counsel should not be filed with the Court. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/17/2021. (Clarke, Melonie) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter Joint Letter in connection with Initial Status Conference by Roger Marshall (Barshay, David) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Scheduling Order by Roger Marshall (Barshay, David) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roger Marshall. Collecto, Inc. waiver sent on 6/2/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re: #6 Notice Designating Case To Arbitration. Counsel is advised that this designation will not affect nor delay the Initial Status Conference scheduled for 6/22/2021 and the submission of the mandatory requirements at #5 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/19/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE Designating Case To Arbitration. This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) which requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs. Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d)(3). (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 6/22/2021 at 12:45 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 2585#. The parties are directed to comply with the attached mandatory requirements including filing on the docket a completed case management plan prior to the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/10/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 US Asset summons) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Collecto, Inc. d/b/a EOS CCA, US Asset Management, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14452059 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Roger Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 05/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less