This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 10:18:01 (UTC).

Marshall et al v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Marshall filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy C. Batten, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy C. Batten, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Marshall

Carrollton, GA 30117

John Shorter

Carrollton, GA 30117

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology, Inc.

Wright Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Alice E. Snedeker

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1075 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11452428) filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Proposed Order

3 #2

Exhibit A

3 #3

Exhibit B

3 #4

Exhibit C

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER directing Plaintiffs to either amend their complaint or respond to the #2 MOTION to Dismiss and #3 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court believes that Plaintiffs provided an incorrect zip code for their mailing address in their summonses. Thus, the Clerk is directed to mail copies of Defendants' motions to dismiss to Plaintiffs addresses provided in the order. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/12/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #5 Order to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (dmb) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Michael Marshall and John Shorter re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #5 Order, #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. (dmb) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER directing Plaintiffs to either amend their complaint or respond to the #2 MOTION to Dismiss and #3 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court believes that Plaintiffs provided an incorrect zip code for their mailing address in their summonses. Thus, the Clerk is directed to mail copies of Defendants' motions to dismiss to Plaintiffs addresses provided in the order. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/12/2022. (dmb) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr.. (jkb) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction with Brief In Support by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Wright Medical Group, Inc., Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snedeker, Alice) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11452428) filed by Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Wright Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alice Egan Snedeker