This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:19:35 (UTC).

Marshall et al v. National Credit Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Marshall filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against National Credit Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael L. Brown and Russell G. Vineyard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05491

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

Referral Judge

Russell G. Vineyard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Krista Lynn Marshall

Doyl Albert Marshall

Defendant

National Credit Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Lewis Erkenbrack

Attorney at Berry & Associates

2751 Buford Highway Ne, Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30324

Adam Klein

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krista Lynn Marshall, Doyl Albert Marshall. National Credit Systems, Inc. waiver mailed on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Doyl Albert Marshall and Krista Lynn Marshall (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9153486). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Krista Lynn Marshall, Doyl Albert Marshall. National Credit Systems, Inc. waiver mailed on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020. (Erkenbrack, Joseph) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NEF regenerated for #1 Complaint. (aaq) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Doyl Albert Marshall and Krista Lynn Marshall (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9153486). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.