This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2021 at 08:19:01 (UTC).

MARSHALL et al v. CLARKE et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2021 MARSHALL filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CLARKE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04336

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Lead Plaintiff

DOUGLAS M. MARSHALL

Plaintiffs

SIMON CAMPBELL

ROBERT ABRAMS

TIMOTHY DALY

DOUGLAS MARSHALL

Petitioner

Free to Learn Coalition

Defendants

SOLICITOR MICHAEL P. CLARKE

PENNSBURY SCHOOL DISTRICT

CHERRISSA GIBSON

CHRISTINE TOY-DRAGONI

JOSHUA WALDORF

SHERWOOD (CHIP) TAYLOR

HOWARD GOLDBERG

T.R. KANNAN

MICHAEL PALLOTTA

LINDA PALSKY

GARY SANDERSON

DEBRA WACHSPRESS

ANN LANGTRY

ASSISTANT SOLICITOR PETER C AMUSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Lead Plaintiff and Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL P. GOTTLIEB

Attorney at VANGROSSI & RECCHUITI

319 Swede Street

Norristown, PA 19401

ALAN GURA

Attorney at Institute for Free Speech

1150 Connecticut Avenue N.W., Ste 801

Washington, DC 20036

MARTHA ASTOR

Attorney at INSTITUTE FOR FREE SPEECH

1150 Connecticut Avenue, N.W, Suite 801

Washington, DC 20036

ENDEL KOLDE

Attorney at INSTITUTE FOR FREE SPEECH

1155 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Suite 801

Washington, DC 20036

Petitioner Attorney

KATHLEEN A. GALLAGHER

Attorney at Gallagher Giancola LLC

436 Seventh Avenue, 31St Floor

Pittsbugh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

GARY H. DADAMO

Attorney at Sweet, Stevens, Katz & Williams LLP

331 E. Butler Avenue

New Britain, PA 18901

 

Court Documents

55 #1

Text of Proposed Order

55 #55

Main Document

#54

(#54) Proof of Service (Certified Mail) (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

#53

(#53) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION #4 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/17/2021. 11/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#52

(#52) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #4 . SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/17/2021. 11/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#51

(#51) MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED BY HAROLD P. KUPERMIT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

43 #2

Text of Proposed Order

43 #1

Brief

43 #43

Main Document

4 #3

Declaration Declaration of Douglas Marshall

3 #3

Declaration Declaration of Martha Astor

3 #2

Declaration Declaration of Endel Kolde

3 #1

Declaration Declaration of Alan Gura

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/6/21. 10/6/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

1 #2

Designation Form DESIGNATION FORM

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #1

Main Document

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by ROBERT ABRAMS, SIMON CAMPBELL, TIMOTHY DALY, DOUGLAS MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GURA, ALAN) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Proof of Service (Certified Mail) (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION #4 IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/17/2021. 11/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #4 . SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/17/2021. 11/17/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION TO INTERVENE FILED BY HAROLD P. KUPERMIT, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(mbh, ) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MOTION for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Free to Learn Coalition.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae Free to Learn Coalition in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(GALLAGHER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER Motion Hearing held on 11/12/21 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DOUGLAS MARSHALL, TIMOTHY DALY, SIMON CAMPBELL, ROBERT ABRAMS COURT REPORTER KATHLEEN FELDMAN (JL ) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTERin Courtroom 10B Motion Hearing held on 11/8/21 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (to reconvene on 11/12/21) Court Reporter: Kathleen Feldman. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER IN PERSON Conference held on 10/26/21. (JL ) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : THE MOTION HEARING IS SET FOR 11/12/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, ) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 11/8/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN Courtroom 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/13/2021. 10/13/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/19/2021 09:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE: MS. ASTOR SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 15, 2021 TO REMIT THE $40 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR THE COURT WILL DENY THE MOTION. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/12/2021. 10/12/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE: MR. KOLDE SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 15, 2021 TO REMIT THE $40 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR THE COURT WILL DENY THE MOTION. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/12/2021. 10/12/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER RE MR. GURA SHALL HAVE UNTIL OCTOBER 15, 2021 TO REMIT THE $40 FILING FEE TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR THE COURT WILL DENY THE MOTION.. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/12/2021. 10/12/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ROBERT ABRAMS, SIMON CAMPBELL, TIMOTHY DALY, DOUGLAS MARSHALL.Brief and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration Declaration of Douglas Marshall, #4 Declaration Declaration of Robert Abrams, #5 Declaration Declaration of Tim Daly, #6 Declaration Declaration of Simon Campbell, #7 Exhibit Policy 903, #8 Exhibit Email dated 3/31/2021, #9 Exhibit Policy 922, #10 Exhibit Abrams written comment submission, #11 Exhibit T.R. Kannan email exchange, #12 Exhibit 2020-03-12 Special Board Meeting Minutes, #13 Exhibit Rejection of Daly 1-21-21, #14 Exhibit Rejection of Abrams 1-21-21, #15 Exhibit Rejection of Abrams 3-4-21, #16 Exhibit Gibson emails, #17 Exhibit 3-31-21 Statement of Toy-Dragoni, #18 Exhibit 2021-05-20 Board Action Meeting Minutes, #19 Exhibit Proposed Policy 903 Under Consideration 6-17-21, #20 Exhibit 12-17-21 Daly Submitted Comments, #21 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by ROBERT ABRAMS, SIMON CAMPBELL, TIMOTHY DALY, DOUGLAS MARSHALL.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alan Gura, #2 Declaration Declaration of Endel Kolde, #3 Declaration Declaration of Martha Astor)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 10/6/21. 10/6/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to PETER C AMUSO, MICHAEL P. CLARKE, CHERRISSA GIBSON, HOWARD GOLDBERG, T.R. KANNAN, ANN LANGTRY, MICHAEL PALLOTTA, LINDA PALSKY, PENNSBURY SCHOOL DISTRICT, GARY SANDERSON, SHERWOOD (CHIP) TAYLOR, CHRISTINE TOY-DRAGONI, DEBRA WACHSPRESS, JOSHUA WALDORF. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 10/5/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15449243.), filed by DOUGLAS M. MARSHALL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Designation Form DESIGNATION FORM)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSBURY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen A. Gallagher Esq.