This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2021 at 10:50:43 (UTC).

Marshall et al v. Chevron U.S.A., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Marshall filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Chevron U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Fouratt, Jerry H. Ritter and Martha Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judges

Jerry H. Ritter

Martha Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chris Thompson

Byron Marshall

Cory Heckard

Charles Thompson

Defendants

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

DXP Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Josh Borsellino

Attorney at Borsellino, PC

1020 Macon St., Suite 15

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Morgan Scott

Attorney at Borsellino, P.C.

1020 Macon Street, Suite 15

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney St., Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Jesika Blanco

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney St., Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Kimberly Cheeseman

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney St., Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010-3095

Michael Carter Crow

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP

1301 Mckinney, Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77010

John K Ziegler

Attorney at Conklin, Woodcock & Ziegler, PC

320 Gold Ave Sw, Suite 1111

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Melissa Ackie

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

100 Congress Avenue, Suite 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Kimberly Miers

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Nicole Susanne LeFave

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

100 Congress Avenue, Ste 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Kelli C. Fuqua

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

100 Congress Ave, Suite 1400

Austin, TX 78701

Charlotte A. Lamont

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

201 Third Street Nw, Suite 500

Albuquerque, NM 87102

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants shall have until March 9, 2021, to provide their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend [ECF #35 ].(gbg) Modified text on 2/22/2021 added date information (gr). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#33

(#33) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 3/16/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2021. (gbg) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#30

(#30) ORDER GRANTING #29 MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#19

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#5

(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to DXP Enterprises, Inc.. (see) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (see) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants shall have until March 9, 2021, to provide their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend [ECF #35 ].(gbg) Modified text on 2/22/2021 added date information (gr). (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, or Alternatively to Consolidate by DXP Enterprises, Inc.. (Lamont, Charlotte) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by Charlotte A. Lamont on behalf of DXP Enterprises, Inc. (Lamont, Charlotte) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER REFERRING #35 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, or Alternatively to Consolidate filed by Charles Thompson, Byron Marshall, Chris Thompson, Cory Heckard by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, or Alternatively to Consolidate by Cory Heckard, Byron Marshall, Charles Thompson, Chris Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint) (Borsellino, Josh) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by John K Ziegler on behalf of Chevron U.S.A. Inc. (Ziegler, John) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 3/16/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2021. (gbg) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket(#32) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER GRANTING #29 MOTION TO WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. (gbg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (withdrawing Morgan Scott only) and Designation of Josh Borsellino as Lead Counsel by Cory Heckard, Byron Marshall, Charles Thompson, Chris Thompson. (Borsellino, Josh) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIt is ORDERED Defendant DXP Enterprises, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline, Doc. #8 filed December 19, 2019, is GRANTED. Defendant DXP Enterprises, Inc.'s deadline to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint is extended to February 28, 2020. Entered by Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (db) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DXP Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Ronald C. Griffin. (LeFave, Nicole) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Susanne LeFave on behalf of DXP Enterprises, Inc.. Attorney Nicole Susanne LeFave added to party DXP Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft) (LeFave, Nicole) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly R. Miers on behalf of DXP Enterprises, Inc.. Attorney Kimberly R. Miers added to party DXP Enterprises, Inc.(pty:dft) (Miers, Kimberly) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ronald C. Griffin. Signed by Judge David Counts. (see) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to DXP Enterprises, Inc.. (see) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (see) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (see) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cory Heckard, Byron Marshall, Charles Thompson, Chris Thompson. (Borsellino, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12884547), filed by Byron Marshall, Cory Heckard, Chris Thompson, Charles Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Borsellino, Joshua) [Transferred from Texas Western on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DXP Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Chevron USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelli Caitlin Fuqua

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John K Ziegler(Designation Retained)