This case was last updated from PACER on 09/22/2019 at 07:26:24 (UTC).

Marsh v. BP Products North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Marsh filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against BP Products North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00242

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harry F Marsh

Defendants

Keystone Shipping Co.

Farrell Lines, Inc

Trinidad Corporation

ConocoPhillips Company

Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc.

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

Texaco, Inc.

National Bulk Carriers, Inc.

BP Products North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Meredith Kay Clark

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Blvd

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Timothy Alan Swafford

Attorney at The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm PC

30800 Telegraph Rd, Ste 1850

Bingham Farms, MI 48025

John Eugene Herrick

Attorney at Motley Rice LLC

28 Bridgeside Blvd

Mount Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorney

Mark Freeman

Attorney at Strasburger & Price, L.L.P.

2615 Calder Avenue, Suite 240

Beaumont, TX 77702

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Compliant by National Bulk Carriers, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ConocoPhillips Company served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to National Bulk Carriers, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Trinidad Corporation served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Keystone Shipping Co. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Farrell Lines, Inc served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BP Products North America, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Harry F Marsh, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge George C Hanks, Jr. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#2

(#2) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

1 #6

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: ConocoPhillip

1 #7

Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Farrell Lines

1 #1

Exhibit A - Case-Specific Exhibit List

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Compliant by National Bulk Carriers, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Freeman, Mark) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to ConocoPhillips Company served on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Jeffrey V Brown, pursuant to General Order No. 2019-8. Deadlines in scheduling orders remain in effect Judge George C Hanks, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (ndiaz, 4) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to National Bulk Carriers, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Trinidad Corporation served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Keystone Shipping Co. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Farrell Lines, Inc served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Chevron U.S.A. Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to BP Products North America, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 9/23/2019, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Harry F Marsh, filed.(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in 7th Floor Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge George C Hanks, Jr. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (bthomas, 4) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Vanessa D Gilmore recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22849758) filed by Harry F Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Case-Specific Exhibit List, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: BP Products North America, Inc., #4 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Chas. Kurz & Co., Inc., #5 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Chevron U.S.A. Inc., #6 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: ConocoPhillips Company, #7 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Farrell Lines, Inc., #8 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Keystone Shipping Co., #9 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: National Bulk Carriers, Inc., #10 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Texaco, Inc., #11 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons re: Trinidad Corporation)(Clark, Meredith) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.