This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2020 at 07:28:20 (UTC).

Marsh et al v. AFSCME Local 3299 et al

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 Marsh filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against AFSCME Local 3299. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah Barnes and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02382

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lindsay Macomber

Sandi Edde

Rebecca Van Antwerp

Theodore Mendoza

Terrance Marsh

Karen Jordan

Stacey Davidson

Defendants

Xavier Becerra

AFSCME Local 3299

Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mariah Rose Gondeiro

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507-0552

Rebekah Millard

Attorney at Freedom Foundation

P.O. Box 552

Olympia, WA 98507

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Paul O'Brien

Attorney at Attorney General's Office for the State of California

1300 I Street, Po Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Jeffrey B. Demain

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Winston K. Hu

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market St, 26Th Fl

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gilbert Jeh-hung Tsai

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Karen Jordan, Theodore Mendoza, Stacey Davidson, Sandi Edde, Terrance Marsh, Rebecca Van Antwerp, Lindsay Macomber.(Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/21/2020 ORDERING that the State Defendants' deadline to file its answer or other response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is 2/12/2020. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Acceptance of Service of First Amended Complaint and Extension by Stacey Davidson et al. (Gondeiro, Mariah) Modified on 1/22/2020 (Coll, A). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#12

(#12) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/21/2020 EXTENDING the Union's deadline to file its answer to other response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to 3/6/2020. If the Union responds by filing a motion to dismiss, it shall not be required to file an answer to that complaint until its motion to dismiss has been resolved. (Huang, H) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#11

(#11) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Acceptance of Service of First Amended Complaint and Extending Time to Respond by AFSCME Local 3299. Attorney Demain, Jeffrey B. added. (Demain, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Regents of the University of California served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rebekah Millard on behalf of Stacey Davidson, Sandi Edde, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza. Attorney Millard, Rebekah added. (Millard, Rebekah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/26/2019 EXTENDING Defendant's deadline to file its answer or other response to #1 Complaint to 2/6/2020. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Winston K. Hu on behalf of Regents of the University of California. Attorney Hu, Winston K. added. (Hu, Winston) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Regents of the University of California. Attorney Tsai, Gilbert Jeh-hung added. (Tsai, Gilbert) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Coll, A). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Xavier Becerra's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Xavier Becerra. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (O'Brien, Anthony) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

3 #3

VDRP

3 #2

Order re Filing Requirements

3 #1

Standing Order

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by all Plaintiffs. Attorney Gondeiro, Mariah Rose added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8590669) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Karen Jordan, Theodore Mendoza, Stacey Davidson, Sandi Edde, Terrance Marsh, Rebecca Van Antwerp, Lindsay Macomber.(Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/21/2020 ORDERING that the State Defendants' deadline to file its answer or other response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is 2/12/2020. (Zignago, K.) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Acceptance of Service of First Amended Complaint and Extension by Stacey Davidson et al. (Gondeiro, Mariah) Modified on 1/22/2020 (Coll, A). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/21/2020 EXTENDING the Union's deadline to file its answer to other response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to 3/6/2020. If the Union responds by filing a motion to dismiss, it shall not be required to file an answer to that complaint until its motion to dismiss has been resolved. (Huang, H) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Acceptance of Service of First Amended Complaint and Extending Time to Respond by AFSCME Local 3299. Attorney Demain, Jeffrey B. added. (Demain, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Regents of the University of California served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Xavier Becerra served on 12/2/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Rebekah Millard on behalf of Stacey Davidson, Sandi Edde, Karen Jordan, Lindsay Macomber, Terrance Marsh, Theodore Mendoza. Attorney Millard, Rebekah added. (Millard, Rebekah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/26/2019 EXTENDING Defendant's deadline to file its answer or other response to #1 Complaint to 2/6/2020. (Huang, H) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Winston K. Hu on behalf of Regents of the University of California. Attorney Hu, Winston K. added. (Hu, Winston) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Regents of the University of California. Attorney Tsai, Gilbert Jeh-hung added. (Tsai, Gilbert) Modified on 12/23/2019 (Coll, A). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Xavier Becerra's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Xavier Becerra. Attorney O'Brien, Anthony Paul added. (O'Brien, Anthony) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *AFSCME Local 3299, Xavier Becerra, Regents of the University of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mariah Rose Gondeiro* *Freedom Foundation* *P.O. Box 552* *Olympia, WA 98507-0552*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants by all Plaintiffs. Attorney Gondeiro, Mariah Rose added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8590669) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gondeiro, Mariah) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebekah Millard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mariah Gondeiro