This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2021 at 07:20:26 (UTC).

Marse Kingsberry v. Walmart Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2021 Marse Kingsberry filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo A. Rocconi and Otis D. Wright, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03811

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marse Kingsberry

Defendants

Walmart Inc.

Does 1 through 50, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brennan Michael Hershey

Attorney at Hershey Law PC

16255 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1205

Encino, CA 91436

Elias K. Fakhoury

Attorney at Hershey Law PC

16255 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1205

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew O Smith

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

5901 Century Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Macy Valdes

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

5901 West Century Boulevard Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court's Standing Order instructs: If an action is removed to this Court that containsa form pleading, i.e., a pleading in which boxes are checked, the party or parties utilizing the form pleading must file an appropriate pleading with this Court within 30 days of receipt of the Notice of Removal. To date, Plaintiff has not filed an appropriate Complaint despite having filed a form complaint in state court. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file an appropriate pleading as set forth in the Standing Order no later than June 15, 2021. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. (lc) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for August 23, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jp) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Valdes, Macy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Valdes, Macy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31469638 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Marse Kingsberry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Elias K. Fakhoury added to party Marse Kingsberry(pty:pla))(Fakhoury, Elias) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court's Standing Order instructs: If an action is removed to this Court that containsa form pleading, i.e., a pleading in which boxes are checked, the party or parties utilizing the form pleading must file an appropriate pleading with this Court within 30 days of receipt of the Notice of Removal. To date, Plaintiff has not filed an appropriate Complaint despite having filed a form complaint in state court. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file an appropriate pleading as set forth in the Standing Order no later than June 15, 2021. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with Court orders. (lc) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for August 23, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerks Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/16/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1-8 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marse Kingsberry, upon Defendant Walmart Inc., a corporation served on 1/14/2021, answer due 2/4/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, of CT Corporation, registered agents in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHMENT NO. 1-7 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT filed by plaintiff Marse Kingsberry against Defendants Walmart Inc., Does 1 through 50, Inclusive. (FILED IN STATE COURT SUBMITTED ATTACHED OF EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jp) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Valdes, Macy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Valdes, Macy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court - Central District, case number 20STCV48975 Receipt No: ACACDC-31240317 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Macy Valdes, Esq. ISO Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Lodgment of State Court file, #3 Summons, #4 Complaint, #5 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Notice of Case Assignment, #7 Proof of Personal Service, #8 Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #9 Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Jury Demand, #10 Stipulation to Strike Counts 2 and 3 from Plaintiff's Complaint, #11 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Macy Valdes added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Valdes, Macy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brennan Michael Hershey