This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:26:41 (UTC).

Marr v. Monsanto Company

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Marr filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00116

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bernadean M. Marr

Defendant

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David A. Domina

Attorney at Domina Law Group

2425 South 144Th Street

Omaha, NE 68144-3267

Defendant Attorneys

Michael K. Huffer

Attorney at CASSEM, TIERNEY LAW FIRM

9290 West Dodge Road, Suite 302

Omaha, NE 68114-3320

Ronald F. Krause

Attorney at CASSEM, TIERNEY LAW FIRM

9290 West Dodge Road, Suite 302

Omaha, NE 68114-3320

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LKO) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (LKO) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (LKO) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Dodge County, Nebraska, Case number 19-480 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4064658) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Huffer, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:19-cv-00517. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED: Nebraska, 8:19-cv-00517, Marr v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-00116-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 171 cc: JPMDL (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Case transferred in from District of Nebraska; Case Number 8:19-cv-00517. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Case transferred to District of USDC - Northern District of California. Original electronic file sent. (LKO) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case is transferred to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (LKO) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Multidistrict Litigation Panel. Clerk to wait for certified copy of order to transfer the file to USDC-Northern District of California, Docket No. 2741. (LKO) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER by Clerk regarding Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint #1 with copy of docket sheet to Multidistrict Litigation Panel Office. (LKO) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • (#4) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Monsanto Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (LKO) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Request for Location of Trial by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Defendant Monsanto Company (Huffer, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Dodge County, Nebraska, Case number 19-480 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4064658) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Michael K. Huffer on behalf of Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Huffer, Michael) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less