This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2020 at 08:20:17 (UTC).

Marquis ProCap System, LLC v. Novozymes North America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 Marquis ProCap System, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Novozymes North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael M. Mihm and Jonathan E. Hawley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01020

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Mihm

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marquis ProCap System, LLC

Defendants

Novozymes North America, Inc.

Green Plains, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael A. Jacobson

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR LLP

Suite 4200, 161 N. Clark St.

Chicago, IL 60601

John C Gekas

Attorney at SAUL EWING ARNSTEIN & LEHR

Suite 4200, 161 North Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

John J Cotter

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

State Street Financial Center, One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111

Edward J Mikolinski

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

State Street Financial Center, One Lincoln Street

Boston, MA 02111

Joseph C Wylie, II

Attorney at K & L GATES LLP

Suite 3100, 70 West Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Matthew Thomas Houston

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Suite 300, 4350 Lassiter At North Hills Avenue

Raleigh, NC 27609

Michael Ross Annis

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

Suite 600, 190 Carondelet Plaza

St Louis, MO 63105

Ryann Ashley Glenn

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

Suite 200, 13330 California Street

Omaha, NE 68154

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Agreed Motion) by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 3/19/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

#36

(#36) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Green Plains, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

#35

(#35) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Green Plains, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#34

(#34) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John J Cotter on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John J Cotter on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

24 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Todd Becker in support of Motion to Dismiss

#24

TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley granting #35 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Response due by 2/28/2020. Additionally, the response date for Green Plains' response to First and Second set of Requests for admission are stayed.Entered on 2/21/20. (WG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause Memorandum In Support by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Andrew Jacobson on behalf of Marquis ProCap System, LLC (Jacobson, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John C Gekas on behalf of Marquis ProCap System, LLC (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 2: Novozymes/Green Plains Announcement

1 #1

Exhibit 1: Mutual Confidentiality Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3280734.), filed by Marquis ProCap System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Mutual Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2: Novozymes/Green Plains Announcement)(Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction: Responses due by 4/3/2020 OR Status Report due by 4/3/2020. (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: On 3/2/2020, this Court entered a Text Order advising Plaintiff that no further extensions of time would be granted but for extraordinary circumstances. In #37 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Green Plains, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiff indicates that ongoing settlement discussions have been taking place, and as a result, Defendant Green Plains, Inc. has no objection to an extension. In light of the recent and ongoing settlement discussions, the Court will GRANT #37 Plaintiff's Fourth Motion For Extension of Time to File Response. If settlement does not occur, Plaintiff must file its response on or before April 3, 2020. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 3/6/2020. (NRL, ilcd) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Agreed Motion) by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 3/19/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #36 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Green Plains, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss #24 . This is Plaintiff's third motion with each request being a week apart. The frequency of requests is concerning to the Court. Because Plaintiff's Motion indicates that Defendant has no objection, the Court will GRANT Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time. No further extensions of time will be granted but for extraordinary circumstances. Plaintiff must file their response on or before March 6, 2020. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 3/2/2020. (KZ, ilcd) Modified on 3/3/2020 to correct document number for Motion to Dismiss from 32 to 24. (JRK, ilcd). (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Green Plains, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 3/6/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley granting #35 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Response due by 2/28/2020. Additionally, the response date for Green Plains' response to First and Second set of Requests for admission are stayed.Entered on 2/21/20. (WG, ilcd) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Green Plains, Inc. Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John J Cotter on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John J Cotter on behalf of Novozymes North America, Inc. (Cotter, John) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER: With the agreement of the parties, the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Monday, May 18, 2020 at 9:00 AM is RESET for Wednesday, July 22, 2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom B in Peoria before Judge Michael M. Mihm. The Court has reserved three days for the hearing. Any issues/disputes should be brought to the attention of the Court immediately. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 2/14/2020. (MNS, ilcd) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause Memorandum In Support by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause by Plaintiff Marquis ProCap System, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael Andrew Jacobson on behalf of Marquis ProCap System, LLC (Jacobson, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John C Gekas on behalf of Marquis ProCap System, LLC (Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3280734.), filed by Marquis ProCap System, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Mutual Confidentiality Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2: Novozymes/Green Plains Announcement)(Gekas, John) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less