This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:33:20 (UTC).

Marquis Cattle Company v. Murdock et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 Marquis Cattle Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Murdock. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian Morris and John Johnston. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

Referral Judge

John Johnston

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marquis Cattle Company

Defendants

Gary L. Spielman

Chuck Murdock

Chuck Murdock doing business as C&M Cattle

Gary L. Spielman doing business as G&M Agventure

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kirk D. Evenson

Attorney at MARRA EVENSON & BELL P.C.

Po Box 1525

Great Falls, MT 59403-1525

Amber L. Henning

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

8Th Judicial District, State Of Montana, 415 2Nd Ave. N. Rm 300

Great Falls, MT 59401

Defendant Attorney

Casey Heitz

Attorney at PARKER, HEITZ & COSGROVE, PLLC

401 N. 31St Street, Suite 805, Po Box 7212

Billings, MT 59103-7212

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Chuck Murdock. (Heitz, Casey) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Chuck Murdock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Heitz, Casey) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Casey Heitz appearing for Defendant Chuck Murdock Motions referred to John Johnston. (Heitz, Casey) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial served on Chuck Murdock on 1-25-2020, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Evenson, Kirk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial served on Gary L. Spielman on January 15, 2020, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Evenson, Kirk) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Summonses Issued as to Chuck Murdock, Gary L. Spielman. (ACC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Chuck Murdock, Gary L. Spielman, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Chuck Murdock. (Heitz, Casey) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Chuck Murdock. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Heitz, Casey) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Casey Heitz appearing for Defendant Chuck Murdock Motions referred to John Johnston. (Heitz, Casey) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Chuck Murdock answer ddl. (ACC) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial served on Chuck Murdock on 1-25-2020, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Evenson, Kirk) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Gary L. Spielman answer ddl. (ACC) Modified on 2/11/2020 to edit text(ACC). (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint & Demand for Jury Trial served on Gary L. Spielman on January 15, 2020, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Evenson, Kirk) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses Issued as to Chuck Murdock, Gary L. Spielman. (ACC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0977-2416828 (ACC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chuck Murdock, Gary L. Spielman, filed by Marquis Cattle Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ACC) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less