Marquez et al v. Commonwealth of Pennsylvania et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Mackey ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4725101), filed by Maria Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (aaa) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been assigned to Judge Kane. (dmn) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kathryn E. Deal on behalf of Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute Attorney Kathryn Deal is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4727642.. (Deal, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa L. Stine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jonathan Aronchick on behalf of Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute Attorney Jonathan Aronchick is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4728301.. (Aronchick, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ellen L Pierce on behalf of Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute Attorney Ellen Pierce is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4728602.. (Pierce, Ellen) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Mira Baylson on behalf of Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute Attorney Mira Baylson is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4728770.. (Baylson, Mira) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorney and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Kathryn E. Deal, Esquire.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/15/2019. (ve) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jonathan Aronchick, Esquire.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/15/2019. (ve) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Ellen L. Pierce, Esquire.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/15/2019. (ve) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Mira Baylson, Esquire.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/15/2019. (ve) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/15/2019. (ve) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Rebecca Castro, Bernabe Lopez Castro.(Walczak, Witold) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan H. Feinberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Feinberg, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Issued as AMENDED COMPLAINT as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa L. Stine on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Rebecca Castro, Maria Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez. Mackey served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Castaneda Morales, Bernabe Lopez Castro. Chad Ronk served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roberto Castaneda Morales, Bernabe Lopez Castro. Joseph Manning served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faustino Martinez Lobato. Christopher Pasquale served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faustino Martinez Lobato. Clay Forcey served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera. Michael Patrone served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Amended Complaint, by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint)(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to refile their Brief in Support to Document 23 as a seperate document. This event can be located under Responses and Replies. (aaa) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #23 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #13 Amended Complaint, filed by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute.(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Davis on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Clay Forcey, Mackey, Joseph Manning, Christopher Pasquale, Michael Patrone, Chad Ronk (Davis, Jessica) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Boland on behalf of Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Clay Forcey, Mackey, Joseph Manning, Christopher Pasquale, Michael Patrone, Chad Ronk (Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk shall docket Exhibit 1 to plaintiffs motion as Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/6/2019 (ve) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jorge Alberto Garcia, Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Rebecca Castro, Maria Marquez, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Yancarlos Mendoza. (ve) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, John Doe, Clay Forcey, Mackey, Joseph Manning, Christopher Pasquale, Michael Patrone, Chad Ronk.(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #29 Motion to Extend Time, Defendants shall file a responsive pleading on or before October 21, 2019. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 8/22/2019 (ve) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #28 Amended Complaint, by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint)(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #31 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #28 Amended Complaint, filed by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza.(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER granting #31 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/23/19 (ve) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jorge Alberto Garcia, Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Rebecca Castro, Maria Marquez, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Yancarlos Mendoza, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez.(ve) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) Summons Issued as to David Angstadt and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ve) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. Commonwealth of Pennsylvania waiver sent on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by David Angstadt. David Angstadt waiver sent on 10/3/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Clay Forcey, Mackey, Joseph Manning, Christopher Pasquale, Michael Patrone, Chad Ronk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, Jessica) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER granting #38 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/21/2019 (ve) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #34 Amended Complaint, by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #40 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #34 Amended Complaint, filed by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza.(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) STIPULATION by the Parties - Voluntary Dismissal of David Angstadt by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER granting #40 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/4/2019 (ve) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, John Doe, Clay Forcey, Luke Macke, Joseph Manning, Christopher Pasquale, Michael Patrone, Chad Ronk, Andrew Hearn filed by Jorge Alberto Garcia, Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Rebecca Castro, Maria Marquez, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Yancarlos Mendoza, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez.(ve) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Summons Issued as to Andrew Hearn and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ve) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Pursuant to the Stipulation filed at Doc. No. 42- Defendant David Angstadt has been terminated from this action. (ve) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ANSWER to #44 Amended Complaint, by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Clay Forcey, Luke Macke, Joseph Manning, Christopher Pasquale, Michael Patrone, Chad Ronk.(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) The Case Management Conference will be conducted by the Court on 2/3/2020 10:30 AM before Honorable Yvette Kane. The court prefers to hold this conference by telephone. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate this telephone conference. The telephone number of the court is 717-221-3990. The Joint Case Management Plan shall be filed jointly by the parties on or before 1/27/20. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/25/19. (dmn) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Kathryn E. Deal terminated on behalf of Maria Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, and Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez. (Deal, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION - Withdrawal and Entry of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Jessica S. Davis terminated. Attorney Allison L. Deibert for Commonwealth of Pennsylvania,Allison L. Deibert for Clay Forcey,Allison L. Deibert for Luke Macke,Allison L. Deibert for Joseph Manning,Allison L. Deibert for Christopher Pasquale,Allison L. Deibert for Michael Patrone,Allison L. Deibert for Chad Ronk added. (Deibert, Allison) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery Deadline 11/2/20. Telephonic Post Discovery Status Conference set for 11/16/2020 11:30 AM before Honorable Yvette Kane. See Order for further details.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/3/20. (dmn) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) STIPULATION / Stipulated Protective Order by Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Muneeba S Talukder on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Muneeba Talukder is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5057340.. (Talukder, Muneeba) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Vanessa L. Stine on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Seth Kreimer is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5057580., filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioners Muneeba Talukder and Seth Kreimer and Associate Counsel bar status verified (mfa) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Muneeba S. Talukder.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/7/20. (dmn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Seth Kreimer.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/7/20. (dmn) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MOTION for Protective Order by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties motion (Doc. No. 58) is GRANTED, the stipulated protective order (Doc. No. 58-1) is APPROVED, and the production of information in the above-captioned action shall be governed by the conditions set forth in the parties stipulated protective order (id.). See Order for further details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/13/20. (dmn) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Mira Baylson terminated on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Baylson, Mira) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Ellen L Pierce terminated on behalf of. (Pierce, Ellen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER granting #62 - AND NOW, on this 8th day of October 2020, upon consideration of the parties joint motion for an extension of time to complete fact discovery in the above-captioned action, IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties motion (Doc. No. 62) is GRANTED. The parties shall complete fact discovery on or before May 3, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the post-discovery status conference currently scheduled for November 16, 2020 is RESCHEDULED to May 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. All other provisions of the Courts prior case management Order (Doc. No. 52) remain in effect.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/8/20. (dmn) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Jonathan Aronchick terminated on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Vanessa L. Stine on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Taticchi is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5360446.. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Vanessa L. Stine on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Feltham is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5360467.. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Vanessa L. Stine on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Trevey is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5360468.. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioning attorneys and associate counsel's bar status verified. (aaa) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Mark Taticchi. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/25/20. (dmn) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Nicholas Feltham. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/25/20. (dmn) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Carol Trevey. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/25/20. (dmn) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Carol F. Trevey terminated on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Trevey, Carol) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Discovery Deadline by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Clay Forcey, Andrew Hearn, Luke Macke, Joseph Manning, Christopher Pasquale, Michael Patrone, Chad Ronk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boland, Nicole) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) SCHEDULING ORDER: AND NOW, on this 12th day of April 2021, upon consideration of the parties joint motion for an extension of time to complete fact discovery in the above-captioned action, IT IS ORDERED THAT the parties motion (Doc. No. #72 ) is GRANTED. The parties shall complete fact discovery on or before November 3, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the post-discovery status conference currently scheduled for May 10, 2021 is RESCHEDULED to November 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. via telephone. All other provisions of the Courts prior case management Order (Doc. No. 52) remain in effect. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/12/21. (dmn) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Nicholas S Feltham terminated on behalf of. (Taticchi, Mark) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #44 Amended Complaint, by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) 1)(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #75 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #44 Amended Complaint, filed by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza.(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Joint MOTION to Stay Pretrial Deadlines by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Taticchi, Mark) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ORDER - AND NOW, on this 26th day of October 2021, IT IS ORDERED THAT the Joint Motion to Stay Pretrial Deadlines (Doc. No. #77 ) is GRANTED. All pretrial deadlines are stayed until February 3, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall file a joint report on or before February 4, 2022, advising the Court as to the status of the case. The status call scheduled on November 10, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/26/21. (dmn) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER - AND NOW, on this 27th day of October 2021, upon consideration of Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 75), and noting the absence of objection by Defendants, IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint (Doc. No. #75 ) is GRANTED; and2. Plaintiffs shall be responsible for filing their corrected Amended Complaint, removing the relevant Plaintiff from the action. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/27/21. (dmn) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jorge Alberto Garcia, Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Rebecca Castro, Maria Marquez, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Yancarlos Mendoza, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez.(Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) ORDER - AND NOW, on this 8th day of February 2022, upon consideration of the parties February 4, 2022 joint status report (Doc. No. #81 ), IT IS ORDERED THAT all pretrial deadlines are STAYED until March 21, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall file a joint report on or before March 22, 2022, advising the Court as to the status of the case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/8/22. (dmn) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#83) Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Muneeba S. Talukder for Plaintiffs by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Eduin Arturo Cambar Matute, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Talukder, Muneeba) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#84) ORDER granting #83 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Muneeba S. Talukder is terminated. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 2/28/22. (dmn) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#85) STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#86) ORDER - AND NOW, on this 22nd day of March 2022, upon consideration of the parties March 22, 2022 joint status report (Doc. No. #85 ), IT IS ORDERED THAT all pretrial deadlines are STAYED until April 21, 2022. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall file a joint report on or before April 22, 2022, advising the Court as to the status of the case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 3/22/22. (dmn) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#87) STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Carlos Amaya Castellanos, Roberto Castaneda Morales, Rebecca Castro, Jorge Alberto Garcia, Andres Gonzalez Olvera, Bernabe Lopez Castro, Maria Marquez, Milton Francisco Lovos Marquez, Faustino Martinez Lobato, Yancarlos Mendoza. (Stine, Vanessa) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less