This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 08:42:53 (UTC).

Maron v. The Legal Aid Society et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Maron filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against The Legal Aid Society. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05960

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maud Maron

Defendants

The Legal Aid Society

Association of Legal Aid Attorneys

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jay Marshall Wolman

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group PLLC

100 Pearl Street, 14Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Marc John Randazza

Attorney at Randazza Legal Group, PLLC

2764 Lake Sahara Drive, Suite 109

Las Vegas, NV 89117

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Daniel Belelieu

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Julien Jabari

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

200 Park Ave

New York, NY 10166

Lee Ross Crain

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Allyson Leigh Belovin

Attorney at Levy Ratner, P.C.

80 Eighth Avenue, Floor 8

New York, NY 10011

Rebekah Beth Cook-Mack

Attorney at South Brooklyn Legal Services

105 Court Street

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Association of Legal Aid Attorneys, The Legal Aid Society with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Maud Maron. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NYP Article, #2 Exhibit B - BALA Tweet and FB Posts, #3 Exhibit C - Legal Aid Retweet, #4 Exhibit D.1 - Governing Collective Bargaining Agreement, #5 Exhibit D.2 - Governing Collective Bargaining Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Legal Aid Endorsement, #7 Exhibit F - Charge of Discrimination, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Right to Sue, #9 Exhibit H - Notice of Right to Sue).(Wolman, Jay) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2021. Motions due by 10/1/2021. Responses due by 11/10/2021 Replies due by 11/24/2021. (jca) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER denying #18 Letter Motion for Conference re: #18 LETTER MOTION for Conference --Pre-Motion conference re: Legal Aid's impending motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Christopher D. Belelieu dated August 4, 2021., #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebekah Cook-Mack dated August 5, 2021; denying #20 Letter Motion for Conference re: #18 LETTER MOTION for Conference --Pre-Motion conference re: Legal Aid's impending motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Christopher D. Belelieu dated August 4, 2021., #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebekah Cook-Mack dated August 5, 2021. The Court is in receipt of the parties' submissions regarding Defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss. (Dkt. # 18, 20, 22). After review of the material contained therein, the Court is of the view that a pre-motion conference will not be productive in this instance. Thus, Defendants' request for a conference is hereby DENIED. Instead, the Court will set a briefing schedule for Defendants' motions to dismiss. This schedule includes time for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint, although Plaintiff need not do so if she does not wish. The briefing schedule shall be as follows: Plaintiff's Amended Pleading, if any: September 1, 2021; Defendants' moving papers: October 1, 2021; Plaintiff's opposition papers: November 10, 2021 (Plaintiff shall file a single submission in opposition, not to exceed 40 pages); Defendants' reply papers: November 24, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motions at docket entries 18 and 20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/18/2021) (jca) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jay M. Wolman dated August 9, 2021 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebekah Cook-Mack dated August 5, 2021., #18 LETTER MOTION for Conference --Pre-Motion conference re: Legal Aid's impending motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Christopher D. Belelieu dated August 4, 2021. . Document filed by Maud Maron..(Wolman, Jay) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Jabari Y. Julien to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/5/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Rebekah Cook-Mack dated August 5, 2021. Document filed by Association of Legal Aid Attorneys..(Cook-Mack, Rebekah) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Jabari Julien to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24890179. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Jabari Julien to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24890179. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jabari Julien, #2 Exhibit A- Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Jabari, Julien) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) LETTER MOTION for Conference --Pre-Motion conference re: Legal Aid's impending motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Christopher D. Belelieu dated August 4, 2021. Document filed by The Legal Aid Society..(Belelieu, Christopher) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Ross Crain on behalf of The Legal Aid Society..(Crain, Lee) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Association of Legal Aid Attorneys..(jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jay Marshall Wolman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:2000;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Legal Aid Society, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Maud Maron..(Wolman, Jay) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Association of Legal Aid Attorneys, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Maud Maron..(Wolman, Jay) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Maud Maron..(Wolman, Jay) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Wolman, Jay) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Association of Legal Aid Attorneys, The Legal Aid Society. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24781577)Document filed by Maud Maron. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NYP Article, #2 Exhibit B - BALA Tweet and FB Posts, #3 Exhibit C - Legal Aid Retweet, #4 Exhibit D.1 - Governing Collective Bargaining Agreement, #5 Exhibit D.2 - Governing Collective Bargaining Agreement, #6 Exhibit E - Legal Aid Endorsement, #7 Exhibit F - Charge of Discrimination, #8 Exhibit G - Notice of Right to Sue, #9 Exhibit H - Notice of Right to Sue).(Wolman, Jay) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Legal Aid Society of San Mateo County (LASSMC) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Daniel Belelieu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allyson Leigh Belovin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lee Ross Crain