Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 15:29:31 (UTC).

Maro Burunsuzyan v. Findlaw, et al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 Maro Burunsuzyan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Findlaw. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donovan W. Frank and Steven E. Rau. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-00163

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donovan W. Frank

Referral Judge

Steven E. Rau

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Mario Burunsuzyan

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Does 1 to 20, Inclusive

Findlaw

Findlaw an assumed name of West Publishing Corporation doing business as West, a Thomson Reuters Business

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Lee Scott

Attorney at Law Offices of Maro Burunsuzyan

601 East Glenoaks Boulevard Suite 210

Glendale, CA 91207

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Mary Elizabeth Bacon

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

300 South Fourth Street Suite 950

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Leslie A Greathouse

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP

1000 Walnut Street Suite 1400

Kansas City, MO 64106-2140

Michael T Etmund

Attorney at Moss & Barnett, PA

150 S 5Th St Ste 1200

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Findlaw re #23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Etmund, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

#23

(#23) ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Mario Burunsuzyan. filed by Findlaw. (Etmund, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

22 #1

Certificate of Service

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Etmund on behalf of Findlaw. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Etmund, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

20 #1

*Restricted*

#20

(#20) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07182. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau per 3rd/4th Master List. (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#19

(#19) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court DENIES Defendant's motion #13 insofar as it seeks the dismissal of this action, but GRANTS the motion to the extent it requests an order of transfer. The Court TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota for all further proceedings. Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/17/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Findlaw, re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to transfer to the District of Minnesota #13 , Request for Judicial Notice, #14 served on 9/13/2018. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#8

(#9) ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #8 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' deadline to respond to initial complaint is continued to September 6, 2018. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Findlaw, identifying West Publishing Corporation. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Findlaw. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#5

(#5) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number EC068819 Receipt No: 0973-22266379 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Findlaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Leslie A Greathouse added to party Findlaw(pty:dft))(Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Findlaw re #23 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Etmund, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Mario Burunsuzyan. filed by Findlaw. (Etmund, Michael) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Etmund on behalf of Findlaw. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Etmund, Michael) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • (#21) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing David Lee Scott, Mary Elizabeth Bacon, Leslie A Greathouse as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) cc: David Lee Scott, Mary Elizabeth Bacon, Leslie A Greathouse. (kt) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-07182. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau per 3rd/4th Master List. (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court DENIES Defendant's motion #13 insofar as it seeks the dismissal of this action, but GRANTS the motion to the extent it requests an order of transfer. The Court TRANSFERS this action to the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota for all further proceedings. Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, Or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Minnesota #13 presently scheduled for hearing on October 19, 2018, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM in Support of Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to transfer to the District of Minnesota #13 filed by Defendant Findlaw. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Opposition to Motion re: Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to transfer to the District of Minnesota #13 filed by Plaintiff Mario Burunsuzyan. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Objection to Request for Judicial Notice)(Scott, David) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Findlaw, re Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, to transfer to the District of Minnesota #13 , Request for Judicial Notice, #14 served on 9/13/2018. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #8 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' deadline to respond to initial complaint is continued to September 6, 2018. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/6/2018 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Findlaw. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Findlaw, identifying West Publishing Corporation. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Findlaw. (Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 to 20, inclusive, Findlaw, filed by plaintiff Mario Burunsuzyan. (Filed in state court 6/25/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number EC068819 Receipt No: 0973-22266379 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Findlaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Leslie A Greathouse added to party Findlaw(pty:dft))(Greathouse, Leslie) [Transferred from California Central on 1/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FINDLAW is a litigant