This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2020 at 14:38:15 (UTC).

MARMONTELLO et al v. AMERICAN BILTRITE, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 MARMONTELLO filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AMERICAN BILTRITE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is EDUARDO C. ROBRENO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00462

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDUARDO C. ROBRENO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

JOAN MARMONTELLO

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

GARDNER DENVER, INC.

METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

MAGID GLOVE AND SAFETY MANUFACTURING COMPANY, LLC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

HEDMAN RESOURCES LIMITED

ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

BORG-WARNER MORSE TEC LLC

UNIROYAL, INC.

MAREMONT CORPORATION

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA INC.

VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION

DURO DYNE CORPORATION

VELLUMOID, INC.

RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY

3M COMPANY

AMERICAN BILTRITE, INC.

FOSTER WHEELER CORPORATION

JOAN MARMONTELLO

129 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

JASON MICHAEL HODRINSKY

Attorney at GORI JULIAN & ASSOC., PC

360 Lexington Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

CAROLYN MICHELLE SCHWEIZER

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY AND BACON

Two Commerce Square, 2001 Market Street, Suite 3000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

CATHERINE N. JASONS

Attorney at KELLEY JASONS MCGUIRE SPINELLI HANNA LLP

Two Liberty Pl Ste 1900, 50 South 16Th St.

Philadelphia, PA 19102

DANIEL J. RYAN, JR.

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

A. KAI SEELAUS

Attorney at BARNARD MEZZANOTTE PINNIE & SEELAUS

218 W. Front Street, P.O. Box 289

Media, PA 19063

ALYSON WALKER LOTMAN

Attorney at DUANE MORRIS LLP

30 S. 17Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196

ALBA E. ARRIAGA

Attorney at RILEY, HEWITT, WITTE & ROMANO, P.C.

650 Washington Rd, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR.

Attorney at SWARTZ CAMPBELL, LLC

Two Liberty Place, 50 S. 16Th St., 28Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

SUSAN M. VALINIS

Attorney at REILLY JANICZEK & MCDEVITT P.C.

Widener Building, Suite 410, One South Penn Square

Philadelphia, PA 19107

JASON MICHAEL HODRINSKY

Attorney at GORI JULIAN & ASSOC., PC

360 Lexington Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Other Attorneys

KEVIN J O'BRIEN

Attorney at MARKS, O'NEILL, O'BRIEN, DOHERTY & KELLY, P.C.

One Penn Center, 1617 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1010

Philadelphia, PA 19103

DAVID JUSTIN DINO

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

100 Wall Street, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10005

BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL

Attorney at GOLDFEIN & JOSEPH PC

1880 John F Kennedy Blvd, 20Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

CHRISTIAN A WEIMANN

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JAMES P. HADDEN

Attorney at MARON MARVEL BRADLEY & ANDERSON PA

Three Logan Square, 1717 Arch St, Ste 3710

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TERENCE M. PITT

Attorney at GOLDFEIN & JOSEPH

1880 Jfk Boulevard, 20Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JOSEPH I FONTAK

Attorney at LEADER & BERKON LLP

1515 Market St Suite 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19102

THERESA M. MULLANEY

Attorney at KENT & MCBRIDE PC

1617 Jfk Blvd, Ste 1200

Philadelphia, PA 19103

WILLIAM R. ADAMS

Attorney at DICKIE MCCAMEY & CHILCOTE

1650 Arch St Suite 2110

Philadelphia, PA 19103

TIFFANY GIANGIULIO

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

2000 Market St Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

W. MATTHEW REBER

Attorney at KELLEY JASON MCGUIRE & SPINELLI & HANNA

Two Liberty Place, Suite 1900, 50 South 16Th Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#73

#72

#71

#70

#69

#68

#67

#66

#65

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 3/20/2019 (md). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 3/20/2019 (md). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of VANDERBILT MINERALS, LLC with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CRANE COMPANY.(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE of Appearance by G. DANIEL BRUCH, JR on behalf of CRANE COMPANY with Jury Demand(BRUCH, G.) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ANSWER to Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CRANE COMPANY, Jury Demand, Answer to Crossclaims, Certificate of Service.(BRUCH, G.) Modified on 3/20/2019 (md). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR REMAND (ECF NO. #20 ) IS GRANTED AND THE CASE IS REMANDED TO THE COURT OF COMMON PLEAS OF PHILADELPHIA COUNTY. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED THAT: (1) THE PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS (ECF NOS. #10 & #26 ) ARE DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE: AND (2) THE CASE ASSOCIATED WITH THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER SHALL BE MARKED AS CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 3/18/19. 3/19/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by FORD MOTOR COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D)(LOTMAN, ALYSON) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE M. PITT on behalf of FLOWSERVE U.S., INC. (PITT, TERENCE) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by BERNARD L. LEVINTHAL on behalf of FLOWSERVE U.S., INC. with Certificate of Service(LEVINTHAL, BERNARD) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Johnson Controls International with Certificate of Service by YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION.(LUXTON, STEVEN) (INCORRECT PDF; ATTY HAS REFILED AT PAPER #11) Modified on 2/7/2019 (md). Modified on 2/8/2019 (md). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including ITT with Certificate of Service by GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), LLC.(LUXTON, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. LUXTON on behalf of GOULDS PUMPS (IPG), LLC with Certificate of Service(LUXTON, STEVEN) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC.(REBER, W.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by W. MATTHEW REBER on behalf of STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC with Certificate of Service(REBER, W.) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by VIAD CORPORATION from Court of Common Pleas, Philadelphia County, Civil Division, December Term 2018, No. 3262, together with Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 191812)(ti, ) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEDMAN RESOURCES LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Vellumoid, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant