This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/31/2021 at 08:51:12 (UTC).

Marlowe Cackin v. Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Marlowe Cackin filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U S , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna, John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00982

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judges

James V. Selna

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marlowe Cackin

Defendants

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fawn F Bekam

Attorney at Aegis Law Firm PC

9811 Irvine Center Drive Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92618

Samuel A Wong

Attorney at Aegis Law Firm PC

9811 Irvine Center Drive Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92618

Jessica L Campbell

Attorney at Aegis Law Firm PC

9811 Irvine Center Drive Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92618

Kashif Haque

Attorney at Aegis Law Firm PC

9811 Irvine Center Drive Suite 100

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

Amberly A Morgan

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

111 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701-4093

Jennifer Neiman Hinds

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

111 Congress Avenue

Austin, TX 78701-4093

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

#16

#15

14 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Fawn F. Bekam

14 #14

Main Document

#13

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court. Case number: 30-02021-01185140-CU-OE-CXC. (jp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTINGSTIPULATION TO REMANDREMOVED ACTION #17 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Based on the stipulation of the Parties, the above-captioned matter, originally commenced in state court as Marlowe Cackin v. Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc., Case No. 30-2021-01185140-CU-OE-CXC, is hereby remanded to Orange County Superior Court, with each Party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. (Made JS-6 Case Terminated.) (jp) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Marlowe Cackin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bekam, Fawn) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marlowe Cackin, identifying Marlowe Cackin. (Bekam, Fawn) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Marlowe Cackin #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Marlowe Cackin. Motion set for hearing on 11/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Fawn F. Bekam) (Bekam, Fawn) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference set for 8/6/2021 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for details. (mku) (Entered: 06/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (mku) (Entered: 06/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-02281 JLS (JDEx). Case transferred from Judge James V. Selna to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:21-cv-00982 JLS (JDEx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (esa) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge James V. Selna for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to John D. Early. New Case Number 8:21-cv-982 JVS(JDEx). (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action filed by defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.. (Morgan, Amberly) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Laura Price Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.. (Morgan, Amberly) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.. (Morgan, Amberly) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.. Related Case(s): 8:20-cv-02281 (Morgan, Amberly) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc., identifying Ingersoll-Rand Industrial U.S. is wholly owned by Ingersoll-Rand Services Company. (Morgan, Amberly) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL-FILED as COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31392319 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. (Attorney Amberly A Morgan added to party Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.(pty:dft))(Morgan, Amberly) Modified on 6/2/2021 (ghap. (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #2 filed by Defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/1/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, inclusive, Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc., filed by plaintiff Marlowe Cackin. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/22/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL-FILED as NOTICE filed by defendant Ingeroll-Rand Industrial U.S., Inc.. Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Notice of Related Case, #4 Notice of Pendency of Other Action, #5 Declaration of Laura Price)(Morgan, Amberly) Modified on 6/2/2021 (ghap). (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGERSOLL-RAND INDUSTRIAL U.S., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fawn F Bekam

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel A Wong

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L Campbell