This case was last updated from PACER on 09/02/2021 at 07:48:22 (UTC).

Marler et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 Marler filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03190

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jared Marler

Carrie Marler

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Schrumpf

Attorney at Schrumpf & Schrumpf

3801 Maplewood Dr

Sulphur, LA 70663

Defendant Attorneys

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Courtney Lehan Fournet

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/1/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to John Powers Wolff, III on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/15/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Notice of Compliance

1 #2

Notice to Adverse Party

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC, Parish of Calcasieu, Case Number 2021-2636 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4804623) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Notice of Compliance, #4 Exhibit)(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/1/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to John Powers Wolff, III on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/15/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 14th JDC, Parish of Calcasieu. Scottsdale Insurance Co answer due 9/8/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #4 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC, Parish of Calcasieu, Case Number 2021-2636 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4804623) filed by Scottsdale Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Notice to Adverse Party, #3 Notice of Compliance, #4 Exhibit)(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rae Dietz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Powers Wolff, III