This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/20/2021 at 09:06:26 (UTC).

Markey v. Keystone Dedicated Logistics Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Markey filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Keystone Dedicated Logistics Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ricardo H Hinojosa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ricardo H Hinojosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nieva Mae Markey

Defendants

Alberto Riojas

Teofilo Guajardo

Carlos Lopez-Abrajan

David Riojas

Aguilar Brothers Express INC

Innovia Films America INC

Keystone Dedicated Logistics Company, LLC

Anastacio Martinez

Linea Azul Transport, INC

Cynthia Ibarra

Pan American Express, INC d/b/a Panamex

Klar Trucking INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fidel Rodriguez, Jr

Raymond L Thomas, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Pablo Enrique Rivera Martinez

Christopher Clarke Peterson

Jose I Maldonado, Jr

Celia Guerra

John A Guerra

Nicholas Arthur Parma

Albert M Gutierrez

Adam Brett Chambers

Steven ONeal Grubbs

Kelly Canales Feicht

 

Court Documents

#14

#11

#13

#12

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #1

Proposed Order Agreed Order For Remand

#5

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER OF REMAND GRANTING #4 MOTION to Remand. Case terminated on 03/09/21(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Striking Document re: #10 Defendant, Panamerican Express, Inc. d/b/a Panamex's Initial Disclosures (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Striking Document re: #8 Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures to Defendants Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER Striking Document re: #7 Defendants' Linea Azul Transport, Inc., Carlos Lopez-Abrajan, and David Rojas' Initial Disclosures (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Pan American Express, INC, filed.(Chambers, Adam) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Nieva Mae Markey(a/n/f D.M, R.M, T.M and K.M), Nieva Mae Markey(Individually and as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Sean Markey, Deceased), filed.(Rodriguez, Fidel) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Nieva Mae Markey(a/n/f D.M, R.M, T.M and K.M), Nieva Mae Markey(Individually and as Independent Executrix of the Estate of Sean Markey, Deceased), filed.(Rodriguez, Fidel) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Linea Azul Transport, INC, Carlos Lopez-Abrajan, filed.(Peterson, Christopher) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Nieva Mae Markey(a/n/f D.M, R.M, T.M and K.M), filed.(Thomas, Raymond) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed SUPPLEMENT to #4 MOTION to Remand by Nieva Mae Markey(a/n/f D.M, R.M, T.M and K.M), filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Order For Remand)(Thomas, Raymond) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand by Nieva Mae Markey(a/n/f D.M, R.M, T.M and K.M), filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas, Raymond) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *Plaintiff's NOTICE* to Dismiss Keystone Dedicated Logistic Company LLC by Nieva Mae Markey(a/n/f D.M, R.M, T.M and K.M), filed. Motion Docket Date 2/16/2021. (Thomas, Raymond). *Modified on 2/3/2021 [corrected docketing text](ndavila, 7). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/10/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 381st Judicial District, case number DC-19-49 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25826929) filed by Keystone Dedicated Logistics Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit Exhibit)(Parma, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less