Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2021 at 09:03:31 (UTC).

Marken v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., et al.,

Case Summary

On 01/08/2021 Marken filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc , . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00118

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kristy Marken

Defendants

Teva Women's Health LLC

Teva Women

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc

The Cooper Companies Inc

Coopersurgical Inc

Duramed Pharmaceuticals Inc A Division of Barr Pharmaceuticals, Inc. doing business as Teva Women's Health Inc

Teva Women's Health Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Roxanne Barton Conlin

Attorney at Roxanne Conlin & Associates

Suite C, 3721 Southwest 61St Street, 61St Street

Des Moines, IA 50321-2418

Randi Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman LLC -NY

Suite 500, 100 Garden City Plaza

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

Frederick M. Erny

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne, LLP-OH

Suite 2800, 600 Vine Street

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Richard A. Stefani

Attorney at Gray, Stefani & Mitvalsky, PLC

425 Second Street, Se, Suite 700

Cedar Rapids, IA 52406

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Kassan on behalf of Kristy Marken (Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#30

(#30) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court will hold the initial case management conference via videoconference on February 9, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. (instructions found herein). Counsel will submit to the Court by January 25, 2021, a brief consolidated written statement indicating their preliminary understanding of the facts involved in the litigation and the critical factual and legal issues. Counsel will submit to the Court by January 25, 2021, a list of all companies affiliated with the parties and all counsel associated in the litigation. After the initial conference, all attorneys participating in these cases will be required to be registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/7/2021. (tmf) Modified on 1/20/2021 to modify file date of order to date case was transferred in (rvb). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#91

(#36) ORDER in case 1:20-md-02974-LMM granting 39 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. Frederick M. Erny and Gina M. Saelinger Appointed as lead counsel for defendants. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/18/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#90

(#35) ORDER in case 1:20-md-02974-LMM granting 38 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. Erin K Copeland and Timothy Clark Appointed as lead counsel for plaintiffs. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/18/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#89

(#34) Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #34 ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE (as to attached list). Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#88

(#33) ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#87

(#32) AGENDA INITIAL CONFERENCE: Herein is the Court's agenda for the February 9, 2021, meeting. The format of the meeting will be collaborative and additional items may be discussed as needed. Zoom Meeting Link for Initial Conference: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606612652 Meeting ID: 160 661 2652; Passcode: 123456; Dial by your location: +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose); +1 646 828 7666 US (New York); +1 551 285 1373 US; +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose). Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/8/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#29

(#29) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (aar) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#28

(#28) Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00092. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including VANGUARD GROUP, INC. by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14632537), filed by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER in case 1:20-md-02974-LMM granting 39 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. Frederick M. Erny and Gina M. Saelinger Appointed as lead counsel for defendants. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/18/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER in case 1:20-md-02974-LMM granting 38 Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel. Erin K Copeland and Timothy Clark Appointed as lead counsel for plaintiffs. See document for further specifics. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/18/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (ddm) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #34 ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE (as to attached list). Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below are the orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Court discussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendants to each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7 days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month. The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021; Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August 20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposed consent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presenting issues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business days before the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsive pleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are also ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming Case Management Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case caption should indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6. Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court's CM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the Court ORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service. Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated to provide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have not registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want to receive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordance with Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excuse the parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that was transferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., to plaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as to proposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) AGENDA INITIAL CONFERENCE: Herein is the Court's agenda for the February 9, 2021, meeting. The format of the meeting will be collaborative and additional items may be discussed as needed. Zoom Meeting Link for Initial Conference: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1606612652 Meeting ID: 160 661 2652; Passcode: 123456; Dial by your location: +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose); +1 646 828 7666 US (New York); +1 551 285 1373 US; +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose). Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/8/2021. Associated Cases: 1:20-md-02974-LMM et al.(tmf) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Kassan on behalf of Kristy Marken (Kassan, Randi) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court will hold the initial case management conference via videoconference on February 9, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. (instructions found herein). Counsel will submit to the Court by January 25, 2021, a brief consolidated written statement indicating their preliminary understanding of the facts involved in the litigation and the critical factual and legal issues. Counsel will submit to the Court by January 25, 2021, a list of all companies affiliated with the parties and all counsel associated in the litigation. After the initial conference, all attorneys participating in these cases will be required to be registered with the Court's CM/ECF system. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/7/2021. (tmf) Modified on 1/20/2021 to modify file date of order to date case was transferred in (rvb). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/08/2020. (aar) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-00092. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES LTD. by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including VANGUARD GROUP, INC. by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14632537), filed by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH INC., INDIVIDUALLY, AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO, DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., DURAMED PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. A DIVISION OF BARR PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., D/B/A TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC, TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, LLC f/k/a TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 1/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coopersurgical, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Women's Health, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. is a litigant