This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/04/2019 at 07:21:30 (UTC).

Markel Insurance Company v. Industrial Realty Group, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 Markel Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Industrial Realty Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Solomon Oliver, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02049

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Solomon Oliver, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Markel Insurance Company

Defendants

Brenda Hast

Frederick Hast, III

IRG Lorain, LLC

Industrial Realty Group, LLC

Statewide Construction Company

IRG Realty Advisors, LLC

Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brant T. Miller

Defendant Attorney

Justin S. Greenfelder

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

9 #1

Exhibit A

#9

#8

7 #5

Summons Statewide Construction Summons

7 #4

Summons Ohio WC Summons

7 #3

Summons IRG Realty Advisors Summons

#7

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D - 7.9.2019 Order

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C - IRG Answer to Hast

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B - MIC Policy

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - 2019.Hast Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Stipulated Motion for leave to Plead filed by IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Greenfelder, Justin) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Greenfelder and Jude B. Streb filed by on behalf of IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC. (Greenfelder, Justin) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Markel Insurance Company. Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Miller, Brant) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon IRG Realty Advisors, LLC on 10/8/2019, filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Brant) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon IRG Lorain, LLC on 10/8/2019, filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Miller, Brant) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC, Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation, Statewide Construction Company. (D,TM) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Markel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Industrial Realty Group Summons, #2 Summons IRG Lorain Summons, #3 Summons IRG Realty Advisors Summons, #4 Summons Ohio WC Summons, #5 Summons Statewide Construction Summons)(Miller, Brant) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Markel Insurance Company. Brenda Hast waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Miller, Brant) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Markel Insurance Company. Frederick Hast, III waiver sent on 9/5/2019, answer due 11/4/2019 filed on behalf of Markel Insurance Company (Miller, Brant) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplement to Complaint - Amended Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Markel Insurance Company. Related document #1 . (Miller, Brant) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketJudge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Markel Insurance Company filed by Markel Insurance Company. (Miller, Brant) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand for Declaratory Judgment against Brenda Hast, Frederick Hast, III, IRG Lorain, LLC, IRG Realty Advisors, LLC, Industrial Realty Group, LLC, Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation, Statewide Construction Company. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action, 1:17cv01952-PAG Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9507635.. Filed by Markel Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - 2019.Hast Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - MIC Policy, #4 Exhibit C - IRG Answer to Hast, #5 Exhibit D - 7.9.2019 Order) (Miller, Brant) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less