This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:12:11 (UTC).

Markel American Insurance Company et al v. National Production Workers Union Severance Trust Fund et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Markel American Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Production Workers Union Severance Trust Fund. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07942

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Markel American Insurance Company

Alterra America Insurance Company

Defendants

Scott Gore

James Meltreger

Rosie Gibson

National Production Workers Union Insurance Trust Fund

Shawn Ford

National Production Workers Union 401K Retirement Plan

Joseph Vincent Senese

James Malloy

National Production Workers Union Severance Trust Fund

Jose Diaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Robert Novak

Attorney at Bates Carey Nicolaides

191 North Wacker, Suite 2400

Chicago, IL 60606

David Frederick Cutter

Attorney at BatesCarey LLP

2400, 191 N. Wacker

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Markel American Insurance Company (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #11

Exhibit 11

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Alterra America Insurance Company (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #6

Exhibit 6

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Alterra America Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16498221. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 2/4/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/28/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Alterra America Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company by David Frederick Cutter (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Alterra America Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company by Nicholas Robert Novak (Novak, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: By request of Plaintiff, status hearing set for 2/4/2020 is stricken and reset to 3/4/2020 at 9:30 AM with initial status report due by 2/26/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #12

Exhibit 12

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #13

Exhibit 13

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: By request of Plaintiff, status hearing set for 2/4/2020 is stricken and reset to 3/4/2020 at 9:30 AM with initial status report due by 2/26/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 2/4/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/28/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Alterra America Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company by Nicholas Robert Novak (Novak, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Markel American Insurance Company (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Alterra America Insurance Company (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Alterra America Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company by David Frederick Cutter (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Alterra America Insurance Company, Markel American Insurance Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16498221. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Cutter, David) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.