This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:16:36 (UTC).

Mark Watson v. LJ Milusnic

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Mark Watson against LJ Milusnic in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, California Central District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-07332

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mark Watson

Respondent

L J Milusnic

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM of Law in Support filed by Petitioner Mark Watson. (jtil) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

3 #1

CV111

4 #1

Petition

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241), filed by Petitioner Mark Watson. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111) (jtil) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Petitioner Mark Watson. (sbou) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Accordingly, the $5.00 filing fee is ordered WAIVED. (kca) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (kca) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Granting Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Accordingly, the $5.00 filing fee is ordered WAIVED. (kca) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Petitioner Mark Watson. (sbou) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (kca) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111) (jtil) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITIONER'S MEMORANDUM of Law in Support filed by Petitioner Mark Watson. (jtil) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241), filed by Petitioner Mark Watson. Case assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less