This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 08:03:10 (UTC).

Mark v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Mark filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth A. Pascal and Christine P. O'Hearn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01087

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Pascal

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roald Mark

Defendant

Samsung Electronics America Inc

In Re

SAMSUNG CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK S. REICH

Defendant Attorney

JOHN JOSEPH DELIONARDO, JR.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order extending deadline to respond to the Complaint).(Delionado, John) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reich, Mark) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roald Mark..(Reich, Mark) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/22/2022) (tg) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya (Agent). Document filed by Roald Mark..(Reich, Mark) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#7

No Description Available

#8

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order extending deadline to respond to the Complaint).(Delionado, John) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order extending deadline to resp

#9

(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Delionado, John) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move with respect to, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from October 19, 2022 through and including December 19, 2022. This is the first extension of Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint. The Initial Pre-Trial conference is hereby adjourned from Friday November 18, 2022, at 10:00 A.M. until Friday, January 20, 2022, at 10:00 A.M. The parties must submit a joint letter as set forth in Dkt. 5 not later than Thursday, January 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022. LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022. filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 12/19/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/12/2022) (tg) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

#11

(#11) LETTER MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this matter, pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated November 15, 2022. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Delionado, John) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Stay re: #11 LETTER MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this matter, pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated November 15, 2022. Having reviewed the parties' joint letter filed on November 15, 2022, ECF No. 11, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. This action is STAYED pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") regarding the motion for transfer pending in the matter, In re Samsung Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 3055; 2. All deadlines, including Samsung's deadline to answer, move with respect to, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, are VACATED until further order of the Court; and 3. The Parties shall notify the Court of the JPML's decision if the Court is not otherwise notified, and, should the JPML deny centralization, the Parties will confer and jointly submit a proposed order lifting the stay for the Court's review and approval, which will include a deadline for Samsung's response to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/15/2022) (tg) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#13

(#13) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/9/2023) (vba) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMember Case Transferred in on 2/24/2023 from the Southern District of New York 1:22-cv-07974 as DNJ Case 1:23-cv-1087 for MDL 3055 SAMSUNG CUSTOMER DATA BREACH LITIGATION.(jab) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-07974. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (vba) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/9/2023) (vba) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion to Stay re: #11 LETTER MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this matter, pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated November 15, 2022. Having reviewed the parties' joint letter filed on November 15, 2022, ECF No. 11, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. This action is STAYED pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("JPML") regarding the motion for transfer pending in the matter, In re Samsung Customer Data Security Breach Litigation, MDL No. 3055; 2. All deadlines, including Samsung's deadline to answer, move with respect to, or otherwise respond to the Complaint, are VACATED until further order of the Court; and 3. The Parties shall notify the Court of the JPML's decision if the Court is not otherwise notified, and, should the JPML deny centralization, the Parties will confer and jointly submit a proposed order lifting the stay for the Court's review and approval, which will include a deadline for Samsung's response to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/15/2022) (tg) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER MOTION to Stay all proceedings in this matter, pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated November 15, 2022. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Delionado, John) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the time within which Defendant must answer, move with respect to, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended from October 19, 2022 through and including December 19, 2022. This is the first extension of Defendant's time to respond to the Complaint. The Initial Pre-Trial conference is hereby adjourned from Friday November 18, 2022, at 10:00 A.M. until Friday, January 20, 2022, at 10:00 A.M. The parties must submit a joint letter as set forth in Dkt. 5 not later than Thursday, January 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated: #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022. LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022. filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 12/19/2022. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/12/2022) (tg) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Delionado, John) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from John J. Delionado dated October 12, 2022. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation and Proposed Order extending deadline to respond to the Complaint).(Delionado, John) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. Service was accepted by Kartik Pandya (Agent). Document filed by Roald Mark..(Reich, Mark) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/22/2022) (tg) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(pc) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mark Samuel Reich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Roald Mark. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Roald Mark..(Reich, Mark) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Reich, Mark) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26698118)Document filed by Roald Mark..(Reich, Mark) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less