This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/05/2022 at 09:02:05 (UTC).

Mark Johnson v. Cesar Biggeri Hospitality, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Mark Johnson filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cesar Biggeri Hospitality, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-03869

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Johnson

Defendants

Cesar Biggeri Hospitality, Inc. d/b/a Biggeri+Universe

Does 1 through 10 inclusive,

Cesar Biggeri Hospitality, Inc. doing business as Biggeri Universe

Does 1 through 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Ryan E Carreon

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibits A-B

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff Mark Johnson. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Mark Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#9

(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cesar Biggeri Hospitality, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

#11

(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Cesar Biggeri Hospitality, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff Mark Johnson. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Mark Johnson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33422895 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Mark Johnson(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan E Carreon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew K Higbee