This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2020 at 07:47:52 (UTC).

Maritech Marine Services, LLC v. Bay Welding Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 Maritech Marine Services, LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Bay Welding Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00231

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maritech Marine Services, LLC

Defendant

Bay Welding Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert I Hurst

Attorney at International Maritime Group, PLLC

800 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4100

Seattle, WA 98104

R. Isaak Hurst

Attorney at International Maritime Group, PLLC

800 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4100

Seattle, WA 98104

Defendant Attorney

William M. Wuestenfeld

Attorney at Jermain Dunnagan & Owens, P.C.

3000 A. Street, Suite 300

Anchorage, AK 99503

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bay Welding Services, Inc..(Wuestenfeld, William) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hurst, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Conference Report (UNOPPOSED) by Maritech Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/7/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Wuestenfeld on behalf of Bay Welding Services, Inc. (Wuestenfeld, William) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#4

(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Unissued summons re Defendant Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Hurst, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bay Welding Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400/receipt #ANC017208), filed by Maritech Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hurst, Robert) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add receipt number(PXS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bay Welding Services, Inc..(Wuestenfeld, William) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hurst, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docket(#9) SLG TEXT ORDER: The parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling and Planning Conference Report at Docket 8 is GRANTED. The report shall be filed no later than 11/12/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Conference Report (UNOPPOSED) by Maritech Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/7/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Wuestenfeld on behalf of Bay Welding Services, Inc. (Wuestenfeld, William) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#5) Summons Reissued as to Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Unissued summons re Defendant Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unissued summons re Defendant Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Hurst, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bay Welding Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400/receipt #ANC017208), filed by Maritech Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hurst, Robert) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add receipt number(PXS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less