Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 08:40:54 (UTC).

Edgar Mariscal v. Arizona Tile, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Edgar Mariscal filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Arizona Tile, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09812

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edgar Mariscal

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,

Arizona Tile, LLC

DOES 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwin Aiwazian

Attorney at Lawyers for Justice PC

410 West Arden Avenue Suite 203

Glendale, CA 91203

Defendant Attorneys

Evan R Moses

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Aaron H Cole

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:20-cv-02071 JLS (KESx). (jtil) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC, (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

1 #3

Declaration of Sonya Granillo-Cathey ISO

1 #2

Exhibit B to the Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01160477 Receipt No: ACACDC-28709274 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to the Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Sonya Granillo-Cathey ISO) (Attorney Evan R Moses added to party Arizona Tile, LLC(pty:dft))(Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Karen E. Scott. New Case Number 8:20-cv-02071 JLS (KESx). (jtil) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC in Orange County Superior Court on 10/23/2020, attached as Exhibit B.(jtil) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Edgar Mariscal in Orange County Superior Court on 9/15/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC, (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01160477 Receipt No: ACACDC-28709274 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Arizona Tile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to the Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration of Sonya Granillo-Cathey ISO) (Attorney Evan R Moses added to party Arizona Tile, LLC(pty:dft))(Moses, Evan) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aaron H. Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan R. Moses