This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2023 at 07:48:16 (UTC).

Mario De La Torre v. BMW of North America, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 Mario De La Torre filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Alexander F. MacKinnon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00751

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mario De La Torre

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Y Jacobson

Gregory Sogoyan

Defendant Attorneys

Abtin Amir

Ivana Bolcheva Saddigh

Madeleine Messinger

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#14

(#14) INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

13 #2

Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure

13 #1

Notice of Apperance

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Apperance, #2 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure)(Attorney Madeleine Messinger added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Messinger, Madeleine) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre, upon Defendant BMW of North America, LLC served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emanuel Jacobo, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#11

(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (kmh) (Entered: 02/04/2023)

#10

(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-00751 AB(AFMx). (rn) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#9

(#9) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre, (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#4

(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre, (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario De La Torre. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (dbe) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Apperance, #2 Notice of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure)(Attorney Madeleine Messinger added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Messinger, Madeleine) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre, upon Defendant BMW of North America, LLC served on 2/6/2023, answer due 2/27/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Emanuel Jacobo, Process Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (kmh) (Entered: 02/04/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-00751 AB(AFMx). (rn) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre, (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre, (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Mario De La Torre. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Mario De La Torre. (Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34720534 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Mario De La Torre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Kevin Y Jacobson added to party Mario De La Torre(pty:pla))(Jacobson, Kevin) (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less