This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 05:26:22 (UTC).

Marino v. Brookhaven Science Associates, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Marino filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Brookhaven Science Associates, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Vera M. Scanlon, Frederic Block and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04839

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frederic Block

Referral Judges

Vera M. Scanlon

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Marino

Defendants

Zep, Inc.

Associated Universities, Inc.

Brookhaven Science Associates, L.L.C.

Dow Chemical Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Lanni

Attorney at The JD Fuchsberg Law Firm LLP

3 Park Avenue, 37Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant Attorneys

Kathy K. Condo

Attorney at Babst, Calland, Clements and Zomnir, PC

603 Stanwix Street, 6Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Selina Miriam Ellis

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, Ste 15Th Floor

Newark, NJ 07102

Peter J. Pizzi

Attorney at Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP

1745 Broadway, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Joshua Shane Snyder

Attorney at Babst Calland

Two Gateway Center, Ste 6Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Christopher Michael William Pioch

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10020

Lawrence H. Cooke, III

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas, 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

Ariel Leigh Kapoano

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius

502 Carnegie Center Drive

Princeton, NJ 08540

John McGahren

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540

Richard Weingarten

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

340 Madison Avenue, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10173

Joseph B. Schmit

Attorney at Phillips Lytle LLP

The New York Times Building, 620 Eighth Avenue, 23Rd Floor

New York, NY 10018

 

Court Documents

#23

21 #1

Affidavit of Kathy K. Condo

#21

19 #5

Exhibit 5 - Tritium-Strontium 90 -TVOC Plumes Map

19 #4

Exhibit 4 - Tritium Plume Maps

19 #3

Exhibit 3 - Strontium 90 Plume Maps

19 #2

Exhibit 2 - TVOC Plume Maps

19 #1

Exhibit 1 - Operating Unit Maps

#19

1 #12

Exhibit

1 #11

Exhibit

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Marino re #19 Amended Complaint, (Lanni, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/21/2019. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/21/2019. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11952241. by Zep, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joshua S. Snyder, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Snyder, Joshua) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11948688. by Zep, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kathy K. Condo) (Condo, Kathy) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Notice of Related Case as indicated on the Civil Cover Sheet; 2:19-cv-05729(LDH)(JO). (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joseph Marino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Operating Unit Maps, #2 Exhibit 2 - TVOC Plume Maps, #3 Exhibit 3 - Strontium 90 Plume Maps, #4 Exhibit 4 - Tritium Plume Maps, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tritium-Strontium 90 -TVOC Plumes Map) (Lanni, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Related Case as indicated on Civil Cover Sheet; 19-cv-05475 (DRH)(GRB) (Vanderbilt, Evelyn) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DECLARATION re: Affidavits of Service by Joseph Marino (Lanni, Joseph) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/2/2019. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence H. Cooke, III on behalf of Associated Universities, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cooke, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael William Pioch on behalf of Associated Universities, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pioch, Christopher) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STATE COURT RECORD Received from Suffolk County Clerk's Office re: Notice of Removal Index #613256-19. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 10/21/2019 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 13A South. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendants' counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 10/17/2019. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference unless in an emergency. Defendants' deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 10/4/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 8/26/2019. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/23/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel Leigh Kapoano on behalf of Brookhaven Science Associates, L.L.C. (aty to be noticed) (Kapoano, Ariel) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brookhaven Science Associates, L.L.C. (McGahren, John) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brookhaven Science Associates, L.L.C. from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Suffolk, case number 613256/2019. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11785869) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit) (McGahren, John) Modified on 8/23/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brookhaven Science Associates, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Associated Universities, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Zep, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY is a litigant