This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/11/2019 at 07:37:04 (UTC).

Marino et al v. Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 06/12/2019 Marino filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01407

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Frank Marino

Monica Marino

Defendant

Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James N Francis

Attorney at Law Offices of James N Francis

2909 Cole Avenue, Suite 118

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant Attorneys

Keron Andre Wright

Attorney at Stewart Bradbury PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

Tasheena Lataura Byrd

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

Amy M Stewart

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019. Motions in limine must be filed and discovery must be completed by 11/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2019. Motions due by 7/1/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/2/2019) (svc) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Wright, Keron) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #12

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #11

Cover Sheet

1 #10

Exhibit(s) B

1 #9

Exhibit(s) A-8

1 #8

Exhibit(s) A-7

1 #7

Exhibit(s) A-6

1 #6

Exhibit(s) A-5

1 #5

Exhibit(s) A-4

1 #4

Exhibit(s) A-3

1 #3

Exhibit(s) A-2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A-1

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 95th Judicial District Court, Dallas, County Texas, case number DC-19-06419 filed by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10048375) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) A-7, #9 Exhibit(s) A-8, #10 Exhibit(s) B, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Wright, Keron) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2019. Motions in limine must be filed and discovery must be completed by 11/16/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2019. Motions due by 7/1/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Sam R Cummings. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/2/2019) (svc) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (svc) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Wright, Keron) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 95th Judicial District Court, Dallas, County Texas, case number DC-19-06419 filed by Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10048375) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) A-7, #9 Exhibit(s) A-8, #10 Exhibit(s) B, #11 Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Wright, Keron) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty County Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keron Andre Wright

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Marie Stewart