This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2021 at 07:57:33 (UTC).

Marina District Development Company, LLC v. AC Ocean Walk, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Marina District Development Company, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against AC Ocean Walk, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-15719

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARINA DISTRICT DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LLC. doing business as BORGATA HOTEL CASINO & SPA

Defendants

AC OCEAN WALK LLC doing business as Ocean Casino Resort

WILLIAM CALLAHAN

Kelly Ashman Burke

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHN MICHAEL NOLAN, III

Attorney at Jackson Lewis, PC

1601 Cherry Street, Ste 1350

Philadelphia, PA 19146

Defendant Attorneys

LEIGH ANN BUZIAK

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

One Logan Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103

JEREMY NATHAN KOLMAN

Attorney at BLANK ROME LLP

One Logan Square, 130 North 18Th St

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#120

(#120) Order Initial Conference set for 2/18/2021 02:00 PM Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/19/2020. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#119

(#119) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-01592. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/09/2020)

#118

(#118) ORDER denying as moot #102 Motion to Stay Case; Plaintiff's claims against Defendant AC Ocean Walk, LLC are severed from Plaintiff's claims against William Callahan and KellyAshman Burke. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant AC Ocean Walk, LLC are transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#116

(#116) RESPONSE to #102 Motion to Stay Case, #18 Motion to Dismiss,, #105 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Marina District Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 11/11/2020. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

102 #1

Declaration of Leigh Ann Buziak

#102

(#116) RESPONSE to #102 Motion to Stay Case, #18 Motion to Dismiss,, #105 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Marina District Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 11/11/2020. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

18 #1

Declaration of Lori Yeager

#11

(#117) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Paul Trimmer, Esq., Joshua Sliker, Esq.; Def Counsel: I. Scott Bogatz, Esq., Kerry Kleinman, Esq., Leigh Ann Buziak, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 11:00am; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/ECRO; Recording start and end times: 11:02:54 - 11:12:40; Courtroom: 3B; Due to ongoing concerns for health and safety during the Covid-19 pandemic, all parties appear via videoconference at these proceedings. The Court scheduled these proceedings regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #11 . The Court presents it's Order to Counsel. The transcript will serve as the written Order of the Court. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #11 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated in open court. The Court clarifies it's Order for the record. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

2 #2

Exhibit Policies

2 #1

Exhibit Callahan Agreement

1 #6

Summons Kelly Ashman Burke

1 #5

Summons William Callahan

1 #4

Summons AC Ocean Walk LLC

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B-Burke Employment Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A-Callahan Employment Agreement

#1

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

204 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Order Initial Conference set for 2/18/2021 02:00 PM Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/19/2020. (cry, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-01592. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) ORDER denying as moot #102 Motion to Stay Case; Plaintiff's claims against Defendant AC Ocean Walk, LLC are severed from Plaintiff's claims against William Callahan and KellyAshman Burke. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant AC Ocean Walk, LLC are transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 11/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Paul Trimmer, Esq., Joshua Sliker, Esq.; Def Counsel: I. Scott Bogatz, Esq., Kerry Kleinman, Esq., Leigh Ann Buziak, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 11:00am; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/ECRO; Recording start and end times: 11:02:54 - 11:12:40; Courtroom: 3B; Due to ongoing concerns for health and safety during the Covid-19 pandemic, all parties appear via videoconference at these proceedings. The Court scheduled these proceedings regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #11 . The Court presents it's Order to Counsel. The transcript will serve as the written Order of the Court. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Seal #11 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as stated in open court. The Court clarifies it's Order for the record. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) RESPONSE to #102 Motion to Stay Case, #18 Motion to Dismiss,, #105 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Marina District Development Company, LLC. Replies due by 11/11/2020. (Sliker, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) MOTION to Seal by Defendants AC Ocean Walk, LLC, Kelly Ashman Burke, William Callahan. (Kleiman, Kerry) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) STIPULATION and Order to Sever Certain Claims and Transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey by Plaintiff Marina District Development Company, LLC. (Trimmer, Paul) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) TRANSCRIPT, redacted version of #86 Transcript (SM) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) REPLY to Response to #84 Motion, by Defendant AC Ocean Walk, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julie Stumpe Dressing) (Kleiman, Kerry) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Marina District Development Company, LLC. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Callahan Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Policies, #3 Exhibit C-Declaration of Melonie Johnson, #4 Exhibit D-Declaration of Colleen Hermann, #5 Exhibit E-Ocean Leadership Announcement, #6 Exhibit F-Burke Agreement, #7 Exhibit G-Trimmer Declaration, #8 Exhibit H-Proposed Temporary Restraining Order) (Trimmer, Paul) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John M. Nolan, III to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/11/2020. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile just the Motion for Preliminary Injunction also contained in ECF No. #2 as a separate entry, using the correct event. (no image attached) (EDS) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/28/2020. Pending before the Court is Plaintiff Marina District Development Company LLC's ("Plaintiff's") #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO"). Because Plaintiff did not file the TRO under an ex parte designation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants AC Ocean Walk, LLC, William Callahan, and Kelly Ashman Burke (collectively, "Defendants") shall file a Response to the TRO by 11:59 p.m. on September 5, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Reply by 11:59 p.m. on September 8, 2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DZ) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #2 Motion for TRO, by Plaintiff Marina District Development Company, LLC. (Trimmer, Paul) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Marina District Development Company, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International, Corporate Parent Marina District Development Holding Co., LLC, Corporate Parent MAC, Corp. for Marina District Development Company, LLC added. (Trimmer, Paul) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. ***Emergency motion previously filed in case.*** (MR) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Marina District Development Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Callahan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Policies, #3 Declaration Melonie Johnson, #4 Declaration Colleen Hermann, #5 Exhibit Ocean Leadership, #6 Exhibit Burke Agreement, #7 Declaration Trimmer Declaration, #8 Proposed Order) (Trimmer, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6146552) by Marina District Development Company, LLC d/b/a Borgata Hotel Casino & Spa. Proof of service due by 11/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Callahan Employment Agreement, #2 Exhibit B-Burke Employment Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons AC Ocean Walk LLC, #5 Summons William Callahan, #6 Summons Kelly Ashman Burke) (Trimmer, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marina District Development Company LLC is a litigant